This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2020 at 07:23:36 (UTC).

DANIELS v. TRANS UNION LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 DANIELS filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS UNION LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00364

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmy Daniels

Defendant

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JASON ROBERT DERRY

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN PA - TAMPA FL

201 N Franklin St, 7Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

JOSHUA RYAN KERSEY

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN PA - TAMPA FL

201 N Franklin St, 7Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

CHARLOTTE A LONG

Attorney at QUILLING SELANDER LOWNDS ETC - PLANO TX

6900 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/16/20. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Mediation Report due by 12/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Case referred to mediation. (tss) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (KERSEY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA RYAN KERSEY on behalf of JIMMY DANIELS (KERSEY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

7 #1

Consent to Magistrate

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/14/20. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate) Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/7/2020. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss) (Entered: 08/16/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANS UNION LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TRANS UNION LLC.. (LONG, CHARLOTTE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TRANS UNION LLC. (LONG, CHARLOTTE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY DANIELS. TRANS UNION LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (DERRY, JASON) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to TRANS UNION LLC. (blb) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Trans Union LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5516020.), filed by JIMMY DANIELS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (DERRY, JASON) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadline - CRD to review case and prepare PTO by 10/30/2020. (tss) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 9/16/20. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Mediation Report due by 12/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Case referred to mediation. (tss) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (blb) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (KERSEY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA RYAN KERSEY on behalf of JIMMY DANIELS (KERSEY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/14/20. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate) Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/7/2020. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss) (Entered: 08/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint and #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement. An ISO is needed. (blb) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANS UNION LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TRANS UNION LLC.. (LONG, CHARLOTTE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TRANS UNION LLC. (LONG, CHARLOTTE) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JIMMY DANIELS. TRANS UNION LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (DERRY, JASON) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to TRANS UNION LLC. (blb) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney JASON ROBERT DERRY Re #1 COMPLAINT- Counsel is advised by this entry, that in future case filings the Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedures in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User''s Guide", (both available on the clerk''s website) specifically in regards to the use of UPPERCASE in the parties names and style of the case. (blb) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Trans Union LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5516020.), filed by JIMMY DANIELS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (DERRY, JASON) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less