This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2022 at 11:55:19 (UTC).

Daniels v. Schick et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Daniels filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen K. Caldwell and Matthew A. Stinnett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

Referral Judge

Matthew A. Stinnett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cylina Daniels

Defendants

Jeffrey Schick

New Prime, Inc. doing business as Prime, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Liz J. Shepherd

Attorney at Dolt, Thompson, Shepherd & Conway, PSC

13800 Lake Point Circle

Louisville, KY 40223

Marshall Rowland

Attorney at Dolt, Thompson, Shepherd & Conway, PSC

13800 Lake Point Circle

Louisville, KY 40223

Tyler S. Thompson

Attorney at Dolt, Thompson, Shepherd & Conway, PSC

13800 Lake Point Circle

Louisville, KY 40223

Defendant Attorneys

Palmer G. Vance, II

Attorney at Stoll Keenon Ogden, PLLC - Lexington

300 W. Vine Street, Suite 2100

Lexington, KY 40507

Samuel T. Reinhardt

Attorney at Stoll Keenon Ogden, PLLC - Lexington

300 W. Vine Street, Suite 2100

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Prime, Inc.. (JER) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Parties meet w/in 21 days; 2) Joint status report 14 days thereafter; 3) In the event this matter involves a corporation or partnership, this party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the parties joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 06/27/2022. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#5

(#5) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reinhardt, Samuel) Modified Filers on 7/21/2022 (MDC). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Exchange information due by 08/12/2022. No need to be filed in the record. Motions to Join Additional Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 6/26/2023. Supplemental disclosures/responses need not be filed in the record. Expert Witness reports: Pla due by 07/05/2023; Dft due by 9/5/2023. Discovery: All fact discovery due by 05/26/2023. Expert discovery due by 10/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2024. 2) No motions to compel nor any other motions re discovery dispute shall be filed unless counsel have first conferred. 3) Parties are directed to observe directives re the filing of discovery materials. 4) Extensions of deadlines only upon appropriate motion and showing of good cause. 5) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/2/2024 at 01:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. 6) JURY TRIAL set for 7/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. Counsel to be present at 08:30 am. (5 days). This matter is referred to the U.S. Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for purposes of managing all discovery disputes and pretrial scheduling issues. Discovery disputes shall be resolve as describe in this Order. Objections to the magistrate judge's ruling pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 07/26/2022. (MDC) cc: COR, D, JC (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#7

(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 07/26/2022. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by New Prime, Inc., Jeffrey Schick of Service of Initial Disclosures (Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Cylina Daniels NOS re Initial Disclosures (Rowland, Marshall) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Cylina Daniels NOS re Initial Disclosures (Rowland, Marshall) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by New Prime, Inc., Jeffrey Schick of Service of Initial Disclosures (Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 07/26/2022. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Exchange information due by 08/12/2022. No need to be filed in the record. Motions to Join Additional Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 6/26/2023. Supplemental disclosures/responses need not be filed in the record. Expert Witness reports: Pla due by 07/05/2023; Dft due by 9/5/2023. Discovery: All fact discovery due by 05/26/2023. Expert discovery due by 10/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2024. 2) No motions to compel nor any other motions re discovery dispute shall be filed unless counsel have first conferred. 3) Parties are directed to observe directives re the filing of discovery materials. 4) Extensions of deadlines only upon appropriate motion and showing of good cause. 5) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/2/2024 at 01:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. 6) JURY TRIAL set for 7/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. Counsel to be present at 08:30 am. (5 days). This matter is referred to the U.S. Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for purposes of managing all discovery disputes and pretrial scheduling issues. Discovery disputes shall be resolve as describe in this Order. Objections to the magistrate judge's ruling pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 07/26/2022. (MDC) cc: COR, D, JC (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #5 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MDC) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reinhardt, Samuel) Modified Filers on 7/21/2022 (MDC). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Parties meet w/in 21 days; 2) Joint status report 14 days thereafter; 3) In the event this matter involves a corporation or partnership, this party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the parties joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 06/27/2022. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: Answer to Complaint (JER) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JER) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand FILED IN STATE COURT, SEE #1 by New Prime, Inc., Jeffrey Schick.(JER) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Prime, Inc.. (JER) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 22-ci-160. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5294444), filed by New Prime, Inc., Jeffrey Schick. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit -New Prime Request for Admissions, #3 Exhibit -Response to Request for Admissions, #4 Exhibit -Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel T. Reinhardt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palmer G. Vance, II