This case was last updated from PACER on 08/05/2019 at 07:19:35 (UTC).

Daniels v. EAN Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Daniels filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EAN Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos Murguia and Angel D. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02279

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos Murguia

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Verna J. Daniels

Defendants

Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC

EAN Holdings, LLC

Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tony L. Atterbury

Attorney at Brad Pistotnik Law, PA

10111 East 21St Street North, Suite 204

Wichita, KS 67206

William L. Barr, Jr.

Attorney at Brad Pistotnik Law, PA

10111 E. 21St Street, Suite 204

Wichita, KS 67206

Defendant Attorney

Samuel A. Green

Attorney at Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith, LLP - Topeka

3550 Sw Fifth Street

Topeka, KS 66606

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest identifying Enterprise Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Green, Samuel) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by Verna J. Daniels (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#10

(#10) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 03:00 PM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/30/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/13/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/16/2019. (ht) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for extension of time to file Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Green, Samuel) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest.(Green, Samuel) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#6

(#6) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/15/2019 for Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, EAN Holdings, LLC to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 7/1/2019. (ctv) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Verna J. Daniels upon Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Verna J. Daniels upon EAN Holdings, LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Verna J. Daniels upon Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Verna Daniels. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4829307.), filed by Verna Daniels.(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest identifying Enterprise Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Green, Samuel) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by Verna J. Daniels (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting as unopposed #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff's counsel has informed the magistrate judge's chambers that plaintiff does not oppose this motion. Therefore, the court grants the motion and orders that defendants shall file their corporate disclosure statement by July 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/16/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 03:00 PM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/30/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/13/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/16/2019. (ht) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order Regarding #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement. On its own motion, the court orders expedited briefing on defendants' motion. Plaintiff's response brief is due by July 17, 2019. No reply brief shall be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for extension of time to file Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Green, Samuel) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest.(Green, Samuel) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/15/2019 for Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, EAN Holdings, LLC to answer or otherwise plead Signed by deputy clerk on 7/1/2019. (ctv) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Verna J. Daniels upon Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Verna J. Daniels upon EAN Holdings, LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Verna J. Daniels upon Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC, Enterprise Leasing Company-Southwest. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Verna Daniels. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4829307.), filed by Verna Daniels.(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.