This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2022 at 08:15:40 (UTC).

Daniels v. Clark County

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Daniels filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Clark County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00783

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darren Daniels

Defendant

Clark County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian James Gabroy

Kaine M. Messer

Defendant Attorney

Scott M. Mahoney

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Darren Daniels. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/17/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/1/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Clark County. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#8

(#8) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Clark County. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal, Clark County answer due 6/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Clark County. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/28/2022.(Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Clark County. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Clark County. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Clark County. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/28/2022.(Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal, Clark County answer due 6/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Clark County. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Clark County. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/17/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/1/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Darren Daniels. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-851599-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6906914) by Clark County, a political subdivision of the State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less