Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2020 at 08:03:43 (UTC).

Daniels v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Daniels filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02150

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Daniels

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brandee J. Kowalzyk

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP - Atlanta

Atlantic Station, 201 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Kara Trouslot Stubbs

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KC

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

 

Court Documents

11 #2

ECF Registration Form

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION for attorney Brandee J. Kowalzyk to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5141149.) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Richard B. North, Jr. as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#9

(#9) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kara Trouslot Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-00333. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#6

(#6) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12601501 filed by Dana Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2016)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brandee J. Kowalzyk for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for attorney Brandee J. Kowalzyk to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5141149.) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Richard B. North, Jr. as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kara Trouslot Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-00333. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketRemark - Case transferred to the District of Kansas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Dana Daniels. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-333-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12601501 filed by Dana Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kara T. Stubbs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandee J Kowalzyk