This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2023 at 09:06:58 (UTC).

Danielle Howard Martinez v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Danielle Howard Martinez filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Gavin Newsom,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01796

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danielle Howard Martinez

LaShonda Hubbard

Amber Wood

Defendants

Evergreen Union School District

Standard Elementary School District

Castle Rock Union Elementary School District

Pacific Union Elementary School District

Sierra Sands Unified School District

Happy Camp Union Elementary School District

Keyes Union School District

Sierra Unified School District

Palmdale Elementary School District

La Honda-Pescadero Unified School District

Kings River Union Elementary School District

Waugh Elementary School District

Bonsall Unified School District

Buellton Union Elementary School District

Long Beach Unified School District

977 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph

Fazil A Munir

Andrew M Price

Diana Renteria

Defendant Attorney

Marlon C Wadlington

Other Attorneys

Scott Dale Danforth

Louis A Leone

Kristin Marie Myers

Edward B Kang

Thomas M Madruga

Leonard Bruce Garfinkel

Seth L. Gordon

Sydney Jordan Blaauw

James Kenneth Holder

Gabrielle E Ortiz

Lynn A Garcia

Mark S Posard

Domenic D Spinelli

Michael Witczak

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#143

(#143) MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 , CCA # 20-56404. The judgment of this Court, entered August 24, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA OPINION #142 , AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED.](mat) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#142

(#142) OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED. (aco) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#141

(#141) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. The (9TH CCA) Clerk is directed to reopen this case. [See document for details.](mat) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#140

(#140) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. Submission of the case is vacated, and further proceedings are held in abeyance pending resolution of Brach v. Newsom, No. 20-56291, or until further order of this Court. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this docket, pending further order. (car) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#139

(#139) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. At oral argument on December 6, 2021, the parties should be prepared to discuss the court's jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims against the schools they do not attend and the school districts in which they are not enrolled. In addition, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether any aspect of Plaintiffs' claims is moot. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#137

RESTRICTED

#136

#128

#125

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A to J

#1

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 , CCA # 20-56404. The judgment of this Court, entered August 24, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA OPINION #142 , AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED.](mat) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED. (aco) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. The (9TH CCA) Clerk is directed to reopen this case. [See document for details.](mat) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#140) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. Submission of the case is vacated, and further proceedings are held in abeyance pending resolution of Brach v. Newsom, No. 20-56291, or until further order of this Court. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this docket, pending further order. (car) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. At oral argument on December 6, 2021, the parties should be prepared to discuss the court's jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims against the schools they do not attend and the school districts in which they are not enrolled. In addition, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether any aspect of Plaintiffs' claims is moot. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/21/20 - 1:35 p.m. re Transcript #137 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gonzalez, Lisa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/21/20 - 1:35 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Lisa M. Gonzalez; csrlisag@aol.com, phone number csrlisag2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Gonzalez, Lisa) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) Mail Returned addressed to Seth L. Gordon re Order on Motion for Settlement,, Motion Hearing, #125 (mrgo) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) Mail Returned addressed to Katherine Carol Den Bleyker re Order on Motion for Settlement,, Motion Hearing, #125 (mrgo) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. On November 24, 2020, the Court granted a motion to dismiss claims two through four of the complaint. Dkt. 103. On December 22, 2020, Plaintiffs voluntarily dismissed the only Defendant named in claim one. Dkt. 126. Because all claims have now been dismissed, the Court will administratively close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27869006) #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Application was not attached. Proposed order was only document filed. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendants)(Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PETITION for Appointment of LaShonda Hubbard as Guardian ad Litem for P.C. filed by Plaintiff LaShonda Hubbard. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PETITION for Appointment of Danielle Howard Martinez as Guardian ad Litem for T.W. filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PETITION for Appointment of Danielle Howard Martinez as Guardian ad Litem for K.P. filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION for Appointment of Danielle Howard Martinez as Guardian ad Litem for D.P filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph counsel for Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. Adding Deborah S Skanadore Reisdorph as counsel of record for Danielle Howard Martinez, LaShonda Hubbard, Amber Wood, D.P., K.P., T.W., P.C. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27869006) filed by Plaintiff attorney Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27868769 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez, LaShonda Hubbard, Amber Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to J) (Attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph added to party Danielle Howard Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph added to party LaShonda Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph added to party Amber Wood(pty:pla))(Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less