This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2021 at 23:03:41 (UTC).

Danielle Howard Martinez v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Danielle Howard Martinez filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Gavin Newsom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee, Kenly Kiya Kato, Stephen V. Wilson and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01796

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Dolly M. Gee

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judges

Kenly Kiya Kato

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danielle Howard Martinez

LaShonda Hubbard

Amber Wood

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Governor Gavin Newsom

Evergreen Union School District

Standard Elementary School District

Castle Rock Union Elementary School District

Pacific Union Elementary School District

Sierra Sands Unified School District

Happy Camp Union Elementary School District

Keyes Union School District

Sierra Unified School District

Palmdale Elementary School District

La Honda-Pescadero Unified School District

Kings River Union Elementary School District

Waugh Elementary School District

Bonsall Unified School District

Buellton Union Elementary School District

Long Beach Unified School District

975 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph

Attorney at Skanadore Reisdorph Law Office

16541 Gothard Street Suite 208

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Fazil A Munir

Attorney at Law Offices of Fazil Munir

4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Andrew M Price

Attorney at Law Offices of Fazil Munir

4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Diana Renteria

Attorney at Renteria and Associates LLC

4505 Allstate Drive, Suite 211

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant Attorneys

Kirin K Gill

Attorney at CAAG - Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Marlon C Wadlington

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo PC

12800 Center Court Drive Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

Other Attorneys

Scott Dale Danforth

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo

12800 Center Court Drive South, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703-9364

Louis A Leone

Attorney at Leone and Alberts

1390 Willow Pass Road Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520-7913

Kristin Marie Myers

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo PC

12800 Center Court Drive South, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703-9364

Edward B Kang

Attorney at Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill LLP

500 South Grand Avenue 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas M Madruga

Attorney at Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill LLP

500 South Grand Avenue 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Leonard Bruce Garfinkel

Attorney at California Department of Education

1430 N Street Suite 5319

Sacramento, CA 95814

Seth L. Gordon

Attorney at Leone and Alberts APC

1390 Willow Pass Road, Suite 700

Concord, CA 24520-7913

Sydney Jordan Blaauw

Attorney at Harbottle Law Group

18401 Von Karman Avenue Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92612

James Kenneth Holder

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gabrielle E Ortiz

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo LLP

12800 Center Court Drive South Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703-9364

Lynn A Garcia

Attorney at Spinelli Donald and Nott

601 University Avenue Suite 225

Sacramento, CA 95825

Mark S Posard

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Domenic D Spinelli

Attorney at Spinelli Donald and Nott

601 University Avenue Suite 225

Sacramento, CA 95825

Michael Witczak

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#139

(#139) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. At oral argument on December 6, 2021, the parties should be prepared to discuss the court's jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims against the schools they do not attend and the school districts in which they are not enrolled. In addition, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether any aspect of Plaintiffs' claims is moot. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#137

RESTRICTED

#136

#135

#134

#132

#131

#128

#125

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A to J

#1

186 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 filed by Danielle Howard Martinez. CCA # 20-56404. At oral argument on December 6, 2021, the parties should be prepared to discuss the court's jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims against the schools they do not attend and the school districts in which they are not enrolled. In addition, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether any aspect of Plaintiffs' claims is moot. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/21/20 - 1:35 p.m. re Transcript #137 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gonzalez, Lisa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/21/20 - 1:35 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Lisa M. Gonzalez; csrlisag@aol.com, phone number csrlisag2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Gonzalez, Lisa) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) Mail Returned addressed to Seth L. Gordon re Order on Motion for Settlement,, Motion Hearing, #125 (mrgo) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) Mail Returned addressed to Katherine Carol Den Bleyker re Order on Motion for Settlement,, Motion Hearing, #125 (mrgo) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. On November 24, 2020, the Court granted a motion to dismiss claims two through four of the complaint. Dkt. 103. On December 22, 2020, Plaintiffs voluntarily dismissed the only Defendant named in claim one. Dkt. 126. Because all claims have now been dismissed, the Court will administratively close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-56404 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 as to plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (es) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson on behalf of Defendants Corona-Norco Unified School District, Garden Grove Unified School District, Irvine Unified School District, Moreno Valley Unified School District (Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Corona-Norco Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Corona-Norco Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Garden Grove Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Garden Grove Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Irvine Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Irvine Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Moreno Valley Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy Petznick Johnson added to party Moreno Valley Unified School District(pty:dft))(Johnson, Tracy) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney S Daniel Harbottle on behalf of Defendants Corona-Norco Unified School District, Garden Grove Unified School District, Irvine Unified School District, Moreno Valley Unified School District (Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Corona-Norco Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Corona-Norco Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Garden Grove Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Garden Grove Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Irvine Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Irvine Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Moreno Valley Unified School District(pty:dft), Attorney S Daniel Harbottle added to party Moreno Valley Unified School District(pty:dft))(Harbottle, S) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #128 . (Munir, Fazil) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27869006) #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Application was not attached. Proposed order was only document filed. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendants)(Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PETITION for Appointment of LaShonda Hubbard as Guardian ad Litem for P.C. filed by Plaintiff LaShonda Hubbard. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PETITION for Appointment of Danielle Howard Martinez as Guardian ad Litem for T.W. filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PETITION for Appointment of Danielle Howard Martinez as Guardian ad Litem for K.P. filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION for Appointment of Danielle Howard Martinez as Guardian ad Litem for D.P filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph counsel for Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. Adding Deborah S Skanadore Reisdorph as counsel of record for Danielle Howard Martinez, LaShonda Hubbard, Amber Wood, D.P., K.P., T.W., P.C. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27869006) filed by Plaintiff attorney Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez. (Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27868769 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Danielle Howard Martinez, LaShonda Hubbard, Amber Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to J) (Attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph added to party Danielle Howard Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph added to party LaShonda Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Deborah Sue Skanadore Reisdorph added to party Amber Wood(pty:pla))(Reisdorph, Deborah) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BONSALL UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where SIERRA SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Governor Gavin Newsom is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant