This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2020 at 08:42:26 (UTC).

Daniell v. CMH Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Daniell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CMH Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-01206

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Myra Daniell

Defendants

CMH Services Inc

Clayton Homes

Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc

Robert Murphy

Sheila Murphy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark S Berglind

Defendant Attorney

Damon C Wlodarczyk

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #8

State Court Documents Summons and Complaint

1 #7

Exhibit 7 to Notice - Declaration of Counsel

1 #6

Exhibit 6 to Notice - S. Murphy DMV Record

1 #4

Exhibit 4 to Notice - Petition for Naturalization

1 #3

Exhibit 3 to Notice - Jasper County Tax Record

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to Notice - Declaration and Selected Account Notes

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 11/19/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/20/2020. (sshe, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Rule 26(f) Report by Myra Daniell.(Berglind, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by CMH Services Inc.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Amended Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Myra Daniell. (Berglind, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/7/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/22/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 5/22/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/17/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/18/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/25/2020, Discovery due by 10/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 2/1/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/16/2020. (sshe, ) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Myra Daniell. Service due by 7/14/2020 (Berglind, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Myra Daniell.(Berglind, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by CMH Services Inc.(Wlodarczyk, Damon) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc.(sshe, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CMH Services Inc.(sshe, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-27-00090. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9024836), filed by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc, CMH Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice - Accurint for R. Murphy, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice - Declaration and Selected Account Notes, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice - Jasper County Tax Record, #4 Exhibit 4 to Notice - Petition for Naturalization, #5 Exhibit 5 to Notice - Accurint for S. Murphy, #6 Exhibit 6 to Notice - S. Murphy DMV Record, #7 Exhibit 7 to Notice - Declaration of Counsel, #8 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #9 State Court Documents Acceptance of Service, #10 State Court Documents Notice of Removal to State Court, #11 Certificate of Service)(sshe, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less