This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 06:33:17 (UTC).

Daniele v. United States Department of State et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Daniele filed an Other lawsuit against United States Department of State. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sue E. Myerscough and Karen L. McNaught. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03054

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sue E. Myerscough

Referral Judge

Karen L. McNaught

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER ERIC DANIELE

Defendants

Antony Blinken

United States of America

US Consulate General

Eric S Cohan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Oliver Hacking, III

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

SUMMONS DEPARTMENT OF STATE

1 #3

SUMMONS US SECRETARY OF STATE

1 #4

SUMMONS US EMBASSY

1 #5

SUMMONS US AMBASSADOR

1 #6

SUMMONS US ATT.

1 #7

SUMMONS ATT. GRAL

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Eric Daniele. Antony Blinken served on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022; Eric S Cohan served on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022; US Consulate General served on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022; United States of America served on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS RECEIPTS)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Alias Summons Issued as to United States of America. Original with court sealed returned to Plaintiff's attorney to effectuate service. (ME) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Christopher Eric Daniele as to United States of America. (Hacking, James) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, Eric S Cohan, US Consulate General, and United States of America. Originals returned to Attorney James O. Hacking, III, to effectuate service. (GL) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Antony Blinken, ERIC S. COHAN, U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL CIUDAD JUAREZ, MEXICO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3915758.), filed by CHRISTOPHER ERIC DANIELE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS DEPARTMENT OF STATE, #3 SUMMONS US SECRETARY OF STATE, #4 SUMMONS US EMBASSY, #5 SUMMONS US AMBASSADOR, #6 SUMMONS US ATT., #7 SUMMONS ATT. GRAL)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less