This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2022 at 08:40:12 (UTC).

Daniel Felix v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 Daniel Felix filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-01580

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sunshine Suzanne Sykes

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Felix

Defendants

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cathryn G Fund

Attorney at JML Law APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Dina Ani Issagholi

Attorney at JML Law, APLC

5855 Topanga Canyon Boulevard Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Eric William Witt

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs LLP

555 South Flower Street 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Carmen Jeannine Cole

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs US LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-Proof of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C-Answer

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.; UNITED PARCEL SERVICE. (Witt, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.; UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, identifying United Parcel Services, Inc.. (Witt, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:22-cv-01580 SSS (SPx). (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice filed by defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. Notice of Filing And Service of Notice of Removal of Action With State Court (Witt, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#9

(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 12/23/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cathryn G Fund counsel for Plaintiff Daniel Felix. Adding Cathryn G. Fund as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Daniel Felix for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Attorney Cathryn G Fund added to party Daniel Felix(pty:pla))(Fund, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cathryn G Fund counsel for Plaintiff Daniel Felix. Stephen J. Wiard is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Fund, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Section III of Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123 not signed In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Section III of Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123 not signed In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cathryn G Fund counsel for Plaintiff Daniel Felix. Stephen J. Wiard is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Fund, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cathryn G Fund counsel for Plaintiff Daniel Felix. Adding Cathryn G. Fund as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Daniel Felix for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Attorney Cathryn G Fund added to party Daniel Felix(pty:pla))(Fund, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 12/23/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice filed by defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. Notice of Filing And Service of Notice of Removal of Action With State Court (Witt, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:22-cv-01580 SSS (SPx). (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (RECEIVED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/2/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, United Parcel Service, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Felix. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/27/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.; UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, identifying United Parcel Services, Inc.. (Witt, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.; UNITED PARCEL SERVICE. (Witt, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2213441 Receipt No: ACACDC-33932036 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.; UNITED PARCEL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Answer) (Attorney Eric William Witt added to party UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.; UNITED PARCEL SERVICE(pty:dft))(Witt, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carmen Jeannine Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric William Witt