This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:43:04 (UTC).

Daniel Cohen et al v. Duane Hughes et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Daniel Cohen filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Duane Hughes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08734

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Cohen

David Cohen

Defendants and Respondents

Duane Hughes

Steve Schrader

Robert Willison

Raymond J. Chess

Gerald B. Budde

Harry DeMott

Michael L. Clark

Jacqueline A. Dedo

Pamela S. Mader

H. Benjamin Samuels

Workhorse Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J. Connick

25550 Chargrin Boulevard, Suite 101

Beachwood, OH 44122

Michael Ira Fistel, Jr.

40 Powder Springs Street

Marietta, GA 30064

Brett M Middleton

Attorney at Johnson Fistel LLP

655 West Broadway Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Kristen L O'Connor

Attorney at Johnson Fistel, LLP

655 West Broadway Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Russell S Sayre

Attorney at Taft Stettinius and Hollister

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202-3957

Aaron Mark Herzig

Attorney at Taft Stettinius and Hollister LLP

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Bridget J Russell

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gian Ryan

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John P Stigi, III

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #34 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall have until 1/14/2022 to respond to the Initial Complaint. If Defendants file a motion-based response, Plaintiffs shall have until 2/21/2022 to file their opposition. Defendants shall have until 3/11/2022 to file any reply. The hearing on any motion shall be scheduled for no later than 3/25/2022 at 9:30 AM. (gk) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#35

(#35) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gian Ryan counsel for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc.. Adding Gian A. Ryan as counsel of record for Duane Hughes, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Raymond J. Chess, H. Benjamin Samuels, Gerald B. Budde, Harry Demott, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Pamela S. Mader, and Workhouse Group Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Duane Hughes, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Raymond J. Chess, H. Benjamin Samuels, Gerald B. Budde, Harry Demott, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Pamela S. Mader, and Workhouse Group Inc.. (Ryan, Gian) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

34 #1

Proposed Order

34 #34

Main Document

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bridget J Russell on behalf of Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc. (Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Gerald B. Budde(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Raymond J. Chess(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Michael L. Clark(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Harry DeMott(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Jacqueline A. Dedo(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Duane Hughes(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Pamela S. Mader(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party H. Benjamin Samuels(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Steve Schrader(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Robert Willison(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Workhorse Group Inc.(pty:dft))(Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#32

(#32) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc. (Stigi, John) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John P Stigi, III on behalf of Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc. (Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Gerald B. Budde(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Raymond J. Chess(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Michael L. Clark(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Harry DeMott(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Jacqueline A. Dedo(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Duane Hughes(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Pamela S. Mader(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party H. Benjamin Samuels(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Steve Schrader(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Robert Willison(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Workhorse Group Inc.(pty:dft))(Stigi, John) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Thomas J. Connick on behalf of Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#29

(#29) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael Ira Fistel, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

3 #9

Summons Form to Workhorse

3 #8

Summons Form to Willison

3 #6

Summons Form to Samuels

3 #3

Summons Form to Demott

#2

(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Def Budde (Connick, Thomas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit b - Letter

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter

1 #1

Main Document

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #34 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall have until 1/14/2022 to respond to the Initial Complaint. If Defendants file a motion-based response, Plaintiffs shall have until 2/21/2022 to file their opposition. Defendants shall have until 3/11/2022 to file any reply. The hearing on any motion shall be scheduled for no later than 3/25/2022 at 9:30 AM. (gk) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gian Ryan counsel for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc.. Adding Gian A. Ryan as counsel of record for Duane Hughes, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Raymond J. Chess, H. Benjamin Samuels, Gerald B. Budde, Harry Demott, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Pamela S. Mader, and Workhouse Group Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Duane Hughes, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Raymond J. Chess, H. Benjamin Samuels, Gerald B. Budde, Harry Demott, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Pamela S. Mader, and Workhouse Group Inc.. (Ryan, Gian) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint filed by Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bridget J Russell on behalf of Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc. (Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Gerald B. Budde(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Raymond J. Chess(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Michael L. Clark(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Harry DeMott(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Jacqueline A. Dedo(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Duane Hughes(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Pamela S. Mader(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party H. Benjamin Samuels(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Steve Schrader(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Robert Willison(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Workhorse Group Inc.(pty:dft))(Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc. (Stigi, John) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John P Stigi, III on behalf of Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Harry DeMott, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group Inc. (Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Gerald B. Budde(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Raymond J. Chess(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Michael L. Clark(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Harry DeMott(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Jacqueline A. Dedo(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Duane Hughes(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Pamela S. Mader(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party H. Benjamin Samuels(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Steve Schrader(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Robert Willison(pty:dft), Attorney John P Stigi, III added to party Workhorse Group Inc.(pty:dft))(Stigi, John) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Thomas J. Connick on behalf of Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael Ira Fistel, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristen L O'Connor counsel for Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. Adding Kristen O'Connor as counsel of record for Daniel Cohen and David Cohen for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen and David Cohen. (Attorney Kristen L O'Connor added to party Daniel Cohen(pty:pla), Attorney Kristen L O'Connor added to party David Cohen(pty:pla))(O'Connor, Kristen) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brett M Middleton counsel for Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. Adding Brett M. Middleton as counsel of record for Daniel Cohen and David Cohen for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen and David Cohen. (Attorney Brett M Middleton added to party Daniel Cohen(pty:pla), Attorney Brett M Middleton added to party David Cohen(pty:pla))(Middleton, Brett) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8519584) of Michael I. Fistel, Jr. Esq. by Plaintiffs Daniel Cohen, David Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Member of Good Standing) (Connick, Thomas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Workhorse Group, Inc.. Workhorse Group, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Connick, Thomas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mark Herzig for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Herzig, Aaron) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S Sayre for Defendants Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (Sayre, Russell) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/22/2021. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Gerald B. Budde, Raymond J. Chess, Michael L. Clark, Jacqueline A. Dedo, Harry Demott, Duane Hughes, Pamela S. Mader, H. Benjamin Samuels, Steve Schrader, Robert Willison, Workhorse Group, Inc. (eh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form to Clark, #2 Summons Form to Dedo, #3 Summons Form to Demott, #4 Summons Form to Hughes, #5 Summons Form to Mader, #6 Summons Form to Samuels, #7 Summons Form to Schrader, #8 Summons Form to Willison, #9 Summons Form to Workhorse) (Connick, Thomas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Def Budde (Connick, Thomas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gerald Budde, Raymond Chess, Michael Clark, Jacqueline Dedo, Harry Demott, Pamela Mader, Benjamin Samuels, Robert Willison, duane hughes, Steve schrader ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8505654), filed by david cohen, Daniel Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit b - Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter) (Connick, Thomas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 11/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORKHORSE GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron M. Herzig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Stanfield Sayre