This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:20:00 (UTC).

Danglar v. Horton et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Danglar filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Horton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher C. Bly and Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05512

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lyncoln Danglar

Defendants

Matthew Albence

Attorney General William Barr

J Suntanto

Sean Gallagher

David Rivera

Kevin McAleenan

ICE/DRO W 7401 Jackson

Department of Homeland Security

Sheriff Johnathon Horton

Not Classified By Court

staff attorney 3

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00494. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#13

(#13) MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Lyncoln Danglar. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) calendar days from the date the Report and Recommendation is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/8/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Amend for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by Lyncoln Danglar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lyncoln Danglar. (originally filed as #9 in 4:18cv1789-RDP on 4/11/2019 (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

12 #4

Exhibit D

#5

(#5) MOTION Emergency to Retain Personal Jurisdiction and to Prevent His Removal by Lyncoln Danglar. (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

12 #5

Exhibit E

12 #6

Exhibit F

12 #3

Exhibit C

#12

(#12) AMENDED 42 U.S.C. 1983 BIVENS COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Matthew Albence, David Rivera, Sean Gallagher, J Suntanto, ICE/DRO W 7401 Jackson, filed by Lyncoln Danglar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

11 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

12 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) ORDER denying #5 Motion Retain Personal Jurisdiction and Prevent his Removal; denying #8 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/23/2019. (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/23/2019)

11 #3

Exhibit C

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - After careful consideration of the record in this case, including the magistrate judge's report, the court hereby ADOPTS the magistrate judge's report and ACCEPTS his recommendation. It is therefore ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 12/6/2019. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #11 Motion to amend emergency temporary restraining order, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (aar) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00494. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - After careful consideration of the record in this case, including the magistrate judge's report, the court hereby ADOPTS the magistrate judge's report and ACCEPTS his recommendation. It is therefore ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 12/6/2019. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Lyncoln Danglar. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) calendar days from the date the Report and Recommendation is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/8/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED 42 U.S.C. 1983 BIVENS COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Matthew Albence, David Rivera, Sean Gallagher, J Suntanto, ICE/DRO W 7401 Jackson, filed by Lyncoln Danglar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Amend for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by Lyncoln Danglar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER denying #5 Motion Retain Personal Jurisdiction and Prevent his Removal; denying #8 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/23/2019. (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 MOTION to take Judicial Notice of Specific Comprehensive U.S. District Court Pertinent Related Cases in Support of Petitioner's Complaint and Accompanying Motion, DENYING AS MOOT #6 MOTION To Enter Exhibits as Evidence for Violation of Fourth Amendment "Warrantless Arrest" on Ice Detainers and Other Constitutional Violation, DENYING AS MOOT #7 MOTION For Leave to File Petitioner's Motion to Supplement Additional Claims and To Take Judicial Notice of Specific Constitutional and Statutory Violations in Support of Petitioner's Complaint. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/20/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lyncoln Danglar. (originally filed as #9 in 4:18cv1789-RDP on 4/11/2019 (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00, ALND receipt number B4601097541 (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to File Petitioner's Motion to Supplement Additional Claims and to Take Judicial Notice of Specific Constitutional and Statutory Violations in Support of Petitioner's Complaint by Lyncoln Danglar. (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION To Enter Exhibits as Evidence for Violation of Fourth Amendment "Warrantless Arrest" on Ice Detainers and Other Constitutional Violation by Lyncoln Danglar. (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION Emergency to Retain Personal Jurisdiction and to Prevent His Removal by Lyncoln Danglar. (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to take Judicial Notice of Specific Comprehensive U.S. District Court Pertinent Related Cases in Support of Petitioner's Complaint and Accomplanying Motion by Lyncoln Danglar. (AFS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Plaintiff to pay full filing fee within 30 days from the entry of this Order, failing which the case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/11/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lyncoln Danglar. (deemed filed 3/19/2019 in 4:18-cv-2030-LSC) (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Johnathon Horton, filed by Lyncoln Danglar. (deemed filed on 3/19/2019 in 4:18-cv-2030-LSC)(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 12/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.