This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:23:44 (UTC).

Dang v. Walgreens Co.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Dang filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Walgreens Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAM DANG

Defendants

Walgreens Co. D/B/A WALGREENS

Walgreens Co. doing business as Walgreens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Kevin Laukaitis

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

David Charles Magagna

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Steet, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Charles E. Schaffer

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Melissa Kaye Sims

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 1100

Knoxville, TN 37929

Nick Suciu, III

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

6905 Telegraph Rd., Suite 115

Bloomfield Hills, MI 483021

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by TAM DANG; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19046162. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laukaitis, Kevin) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TAM DANG by Kevin Laukaitis (Laukaitis, Kevin) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TAM DANG by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TAM DANG by Melissa Kaye Sims Local Counsel (Sims, Melissa) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tam Dang by Nick Suciu, III (Suciu, Nick) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tam Dang. Walgreens Co. waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Laukaitis, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 4/11/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tam Dang by Charles E. Schaffer (Schaffer, Charles) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19078728. (Magagna, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by David Magagna #9 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by David Magagna #9 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19078728. (Magagna, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tam Dang by Charles E. Schaffer (Schaffer, Charles) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 4/11/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tam Dang. Walgreens Co. waiver sent on 1/18/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Laukaitis, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tam Dang by Nick Suciu, III (Suciu, Nick) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TAM DANG by Melissa Kaye Sims Local Counsel (Sims, Melissa) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TAM DANG by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TAM DANG by Kevin Laukaitis (Laukaitis, Kevin) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by TAM DANG; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19046162. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laukaitis, Kevin) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Laukaitis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Magagna, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles E Schaffer