This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2019 at 07:36:44 (UTC).

Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co. v. Northland Components, Inc. (TV2)

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Northland Components, Inc TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.

Defendant

Northland Components, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael G Abelow

Attorney at Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37201

Christina Lopez

Attorney at Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

Craig R Allen

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley Napolitan, PLLC (Chattanooga)

200 W. Martin Luther King Boulevard, Tallan Building, Suite 500

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Robert Edward Carden

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley Napolitan, PLLC (Chattanooga)

200 W. Martin Luther King Boulevard, Tallan Building, Suite 500

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

14 #1

notice of consent/none-consent

#14

(#14) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 notice of consent/none-consent) (DJH, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#13

(#13) Disclosure Statement by Northland Components, Inc.. (Allen, Craig) Modified event (not a motion) on 4/25/2019 (ADA). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Northland Components, Inc..(Allen, Craig) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

11 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default

#11

(#11) APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co. by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3930515.) by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

8 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Defendant on 3/18/19, filed by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/05/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/05/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/05/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

1 #4

Other Disclosure Statement

1 #3

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Summons

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Northland Components, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3908702.), filed by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Disclosure Statement)(Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 notice of consent/none-consent) (DJH, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Disclosure Statement by Northland Components, Inc.. (Allen, Craig) Modified event (not a motion) on 4/25/2019 (ADA). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Northland Components, Inc..(Allen, Craig) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co. by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Copy of docket mailed to Atty Christina Lopez showing order granting PHV. (DJH, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christina Lopez on behalf of Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/03/2019. (KRS, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3930515.) filed by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co. . (BDG, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3930515.) by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Defendant on 3/18/19, filed by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/05/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/05/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/05/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Please refile the Corporate Disclosure Statement separately using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest under the category Other Documents. Requirements due by 3/11/2019. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Northland Components, Inc. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Northland Components, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3908702.), filed by Dandong Dawang Steel Casting Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Disclosure Statement)(Abelow, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.