This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2021 at 09:16:25 (UTC).

DANCY HINES et al v. WASHINGTON METROPOLIAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 DANCY HINES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WASHINGTON METROPOLIAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dabney L. Friedrich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00679

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dabney L. Friedrich

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony Dancy

Carla Dancy Hines

Defendants

WMATA

WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Andrew Nace

John F. X. Costello

Defendant Attorney

Nimalan Amirthalingam

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Receipt on 05/12/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 000283 B. (zjf) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John F. X. Costello on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Costello, John) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 17, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY re #1 Notice of Removal filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WMATA (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nimalan Amirthalingam on behalf of WMATA (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#6) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Receipt on 05/12/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 000283 B. (zjf) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by ANTHONY DANCY, CARLA DANCY HINES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Costello, John) Modified docket event/text on 5/11/2021 (eg). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/11/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file their response on or before May 11, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 3, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by ANTHONY DANCY, CARLA DANCY HINES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Costello, John) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Andrew Nace on behalf of ANTHONY DANCY (Nace, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/20/2021, (zjch) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. The defendant shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' amended complaint on or before April 20, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 7, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John F. X. Costello on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Costello, John) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 17, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY re #1 Notice of Removal filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRATA as to Corrected Notice of Removal to Comply with Local Civil R. 5.1(c) by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY re #1 Notice of Removal filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to namirthalingam@bonnerkiernan.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WMATA (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nimalan Amirthalingam on behalf of WMATA (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior Court, case number 2021 CA 000283 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8302751 filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less