This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:41:50 (UTC).

Dana Limited v. S & P Steel Products and Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 Dana Limited filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against P Steel Products and Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00786

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Limited

3939 Technology Drive

Maumee, OH 43537

Defendants

C&F International, Inc.

S&P Steel Products and Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David R. Cooper

Attorney at Marshall & Melhorn

8Th Floor, Four Seagate

Toledo, OH 43604

Defendant Attorneys

Quintin F. Lindsmith

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler - Columbus

100 South Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Ali I. Haque

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler - Columbus

100 South Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Exhibit Notice of Filing Joint Notice of Removal

5 #2

Exhibit Praecipe

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Acknowledgement of receipt of Order of Remand received from Lucas County Common Pleas Court. Related document(s) #6 . (R,Ke) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertified copy of order of remand, docket sheet, and state court record mailed to Lucas County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (R,Ke) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order of Remand to Lucas County Court of Common Pleas. Initial Phone Status held on 4/14/2020. Upon agreement of all parties, this case is remanded to the Lucas County Common Pleas Court. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/15/2020. (15 mins) (D,L) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Joint Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Praecipe)(Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/13/2020. (R,Ke) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that S&P Steel Products and Services, Inc. and C&F International, Inc. are reminded of their obligation to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (R,Ke) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,Ke) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Lucas County, Ohio, case number CI-2020-1732 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-9914186.. Filed by S&P Steel Products and Services, Inc., C&F International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents) (Lindsmith, Quintin) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & F International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dana Companies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Cooper