This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 08:32:20 (UTC).

Dan Jewett Construction Co. v. Cincinnati Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Dan Jewett Construction Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gilbert C. Sison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gilbert C. Sison

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dan Jewett Construction Co., d/b/a Jewett Roofing Company

Dan Jewett Construction Co. doing business as Jewett Roofing Company

Defendants

The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company

Cincinnati Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey A. Mollet

Attorney at Silver Lake Group, Ltd.

560 Suppiger Way, P.O. Box 188

Highland, IL 62249

Steven M. Wallace

Attorney at Silver Lake Group, Ltd. - Glen Carbon

6 Ginger Creek Village Drive

Glen Carbon, IL 62034

Defendant Attorney

Daniel G. Litchfield

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 West Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606-3300

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Litchfield, Daniel) Unsealed on 2/11/2021 (kek). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dan Jewett Construction Co.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Insurance Company for Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wallace, Steven) Unsealed on 2/11/2021 (kek). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Wallace on behalf of Dan Jewett Construction Co. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#5

(#5) THE CINCINNATI LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company.(Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-78-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/10/2021 (kdw) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Insurance Company for The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Litchfield on behalf of The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company (Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bond County, case number 2020L10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4380898), filed by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-78-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Litchfield, Daniel) Unsealed on 2/11/2021 (kek). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dan Jewett Construction Co.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Insurance Company for Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wallace, Steven) Unsealed on 2/11/2021 (kek). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Wallace on behalf of Dan Jewett Construction Co. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THE CINCINNATI LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company.(Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-78-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/10/2021 (kdw) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Insurance Company for The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Litchfield on behalf of The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company (Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bond County, case number 2020L10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4380898), filed by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Litchfield, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven M. Wallace