This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 08:11:34 (UTC).

d'Amico Dry d.a.c. v. Tremond Metals Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 d'Amico Dry d a c filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Tremond Metals Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Peter Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06256

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Peter Cronan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

d'Amico Dry d.a.c.

Respondent

Tremond Metals Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thomas Leonard Tisdale

Attorney at Tisdale Law Offices, LLC

200 Park Avenue, Suite 1700

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/19/2020) (va) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tremond Metals Corporation..(jgo) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tremond Metals Corporation, re: #4 Amended Petition,. Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c...(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) AMENDED PETITION amending #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration against Tremond Metals Corporation.Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. Related document: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent dAmico Societa di Navigazione SpA, Corporate Parent dAmico International S.A., Other Affiliate Medi Supra Pool Management Ltd., Other Affiliate Medi PMax Pool Management Ltd., Other Affiliate Medbulk Maritime LTD. for d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c...(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) PETITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21058026).Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/19/2020) (va) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tremond Metals Corporation..(jgo) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tremond Metals Corporation, re: #4 Amended Petition,. Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c...(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED PETITION amending #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration against Tremond Metals Corporation.Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. Related document: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Leonard Tisdale. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:0009; Dollar Demand $92,406,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 09:0201; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $92,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (sj) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent dAmico Societa di Navigazione SpA, Corporate Parent dAmico International S.A., Other Affiliate Medi Supra Pool Management Ltd., Other Affiliate Medi PMax Pool Management Ltd., Other Affiliate Medbulk Maritime LTD. for d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c...(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21058026).Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less