This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2021 at 08:22:52 (UTC).

Damco USA, Inc. v. Borza

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Damco USA, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Borza. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn K. Mizelle, Thomas G. Wilson and Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01881

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judges

Kathryn K. Mizelle

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Damco USA, Inc.

Defendant

Michael Borza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bridgette Mannino Blitch

Attorney at Blitch Westley, S.C.

Suite 2009100 Conroy Windermere Road

Windermere, FL 34786

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher D. Smith, Sr.

Attorney at Christopher D. Smith, P.A.

5391 Lakewood Ranch Blvd N 203

Sarasota, FL 34240-8509

John G. Beggan

Attorney at Christopher D. Smith, PA

Suite 2035391 Lakewood Ranch Blvd

Sarasota, FL 34240

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Borza. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Borza filed by Damco USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Blitch, Bridgette) Modified on 9/21/2021 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) and Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Borza. Related case(s): Yes (Smith, Christopher) Modified on 9/2/2021 to add second document (CRH). (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Smith, Sr. on behalf of Michael Borza. (Smith, Christopher) Modified on 8/31/2021 to edit text (CRH). (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Michael Borza.(Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Damco USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Maersk Logistics & Services International A/S for Damco USA, Inc. (Blitch, Bridgette) Modified text on 8/20/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Damco USA, Inc. Related case(s): No (Blitch, Bridgette) Modified text on 8/20/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after any defendant appears for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/17/2021. (SMR) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Michael Borza. (CRH) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-1881-KKM-TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Borza (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18559729) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Blitch, Bridgette) Modified on 8/6/2021 to edit text (CRH). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher D. Smith