This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:44:25 (UTC).

D'Amato v. Murphy

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 D'Amato filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Murphy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John D'Amato

Defendant

David Murphy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Jesse Oliveira

Attorney at David Oliveira, Esq.

155 South Main Street, Suite 305, 274-9191, Fax: 274-9190

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorney

Dylan B. Conley

Attorney at Law Office of William J. Conley, Jr.

123 Dyer Street, Second Floor

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Letter

#9

(#9) EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by John D'Amato in support of #8 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

8 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#8

(#8) RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Oliveira, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A Plaintiff's Complaint

6 #1

Supporting Memorandum Defendant's Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#6

(#6) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Murphy. Responses due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Defendant's Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Plaintiff's Complaint)(Conley, Dylan) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan B. Conley on behalf of David Murphy (Conley, Dylan) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to David Murphy. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Request filed by John D'Amato. (Oliveira, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1343913 ), filed by John D'Amato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliveira, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REVISED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for Monday, 8/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM RESCHEDULED set for Monday, 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by John D'Amato in support of #8 Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Oliveira, David) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/28/2019. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John D'Amato. Responses due by 5/29/2019. (Oliveira, David) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Murphy. Responses due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Defendant's Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Plaintiff's Complaint)(Conley, Dylan) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan B. Conley on behalf of David Murphy (Conley, Dylan) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to David Murphy. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Request filed by John D'Amato. (Oliveira, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1343913 ), filed by John D'Amato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliveira, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to David Murphy. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Request filed by John D'Amato. (Oliveira, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1343913 ), filed by John D'Amato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliveira, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.