This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2021 at 12:33:59 (UTC).

Dalziel Dalzeal LLC et al v. Mellberg et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Dalziel Dalzeal LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Mellberg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00377

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dalziel Dalzeal LLC doing business as Dalziel Law Firm

Charles M. Dalziel, Jr.

Marietta, GA 30060

Defendants

Joshua Mellberg

Dickinson Wright PLLC

Joshua David Mellberg LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles M. Dalziel, Jr.

Attorney at Dalziel Law Firm

31 Atlanta Street, Ste 200

Marietta, GA 30060

Defendant Attorneys

Brendan Hanner White

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP-Atl

Suite 2400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

James E. Connelly

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP-Atl

Suite 2400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

Robert Riles Ambler, Jr.

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP-Atl

Suite 2400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

Steven R. Daniels

Attorney at Farney Daniels P.C.

800 S. Austin Ave

Georgetown, TX 78626

 

Court Documents

#18

17 #1

Brief

#17

#16

15 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joshua David Mellberg LLC, Joshua Mellberg identifying Corporate Parent JDM Asset Management LLC for Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (Ambler, Robert) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Joshua David Mellberg LLC, Joshua Mellberg. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Ambler, Robert) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) with Brief In Support by Dickinson Wright PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint and Exhibits , as to Dickinson Wright PLLC. (Dalziel, Charles) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint and Exhibits , as to Joshua David Mellberg, LLC. (Dalziel, Charles) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint and Exhibits , as to Joshua Mellberg. (Dalziel, Charles) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; defendants' answers due 3/5/2021. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/19/21. (jpa) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Dickinson Wright PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint)(Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #7 Order to Show Cause, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO #7 Order to Show Cause filed by Charles M. Dalziel, Jr. and Dalziel Dalzeal LLC (Dalziel, Charles) Modified on 2/10/2021 to add filer and edit text (jpa). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that Plaintiffs SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/26/21. (jpa) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/25/21. (jpa) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Dickinson Wright PLLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (eop) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Joshua Mellberg. (eop) Modified Date Issued on 1/25/2021 (eop). (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dalziel Dalzeal LLC and Charles M. Dalziel, Jr.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number BGANDC-10639988) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dickinson Wright PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Riles Ambler, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Robert Daniels

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan Hanner White