This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:21:49 (UTC).

Dalton v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Dalton filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard Mills and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03210

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Mills

Referral Judge

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn Michelle Dalton

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Chicago, IL 60606-5208

Interested Parties

SSAOGC

CSS-Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter C Drummond

Attorney at DRUMMOND LAW OFFICE

703 W Union Suite 3, Po Box 130

Litchfield, IL 62056

Defendant Attorney

US ATTY-SPRINGFIELD SSA

Attorney at generic ssa account

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 8/25/2020. (GL, ilcd) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 9/1/2020. (GL, ilcd) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (US ATTY-SPRINGFIELD SSA, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Drummond, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. U.S. Attorney General served on 8/26/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (GL, ilcd) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 8/25/2020. (GL, ilcd) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Peter C Drummond on behalf of Lynn Michelle Dalton (Drummond, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lynn Michelle Dalton. Responses due by 9/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplemental Affidavit)(Drummond, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lynn Michelle Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Drummond, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less