This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 09:25:12 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On October 21, 2022, Dali Wireless, Inc. (“Dali” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Andrea L. Fair and Claire A. Henry of Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc. (collectively, “T-Mobile”), Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (collectively, “Ericsson”), CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope, Inc., and CommScope Technologies LLC (collectively, “CommScope”) (all collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief with damages for alleged patent infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas.

Plaintiff filed this action for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent Nos. 10,750,382 (the “’382 patent”), 9,197,358 (the “’358 patent”), 11,026,232 (the “’232 patent”), 10,334,499 (the “’499 patent”), 8,682,338 (the “’338 patent”), 11,006,343 (the “’343 patent”),and 9,820,171 (the “’171 patent”) (collectively, the “Patents-in-Suit”). 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “T-Mobile and CommScope have been infringing the ’382 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include equipment relating to small cell wireless solutions, such as CommScope’s ION®-E/ERA platform.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “T-Mobile and CommScope have been infringing the ’358 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include equipment relating to small cell wireless solutions, such as CommScope’s OneCell product.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “T-Mobile and CommScope have been infringing the ’232 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include small cell wireless solutions such as CommScope’s ION®-E/ERA platform.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “T-Mobile and CommScope have been infringing the ’499 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include small cell wireless solutions such as CommScope’s ION®-E/ERA platform.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “T-Mobile and CommScope have been infringing the ’343 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include small cell wireless solutions such as CommScope’s ION®-E/ERA platform.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “T-Mobile and Ericsson have been infringing the ’499 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include small cell wireless solutions such as Ericsson’s Radio Dot System.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “T-Mobile and Ericsson have been infringing the ’338 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include small cell wireless solutions such as Ericsson’s Radio Dot System.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “T-Mobile and Ericsson have been infringing the ’343 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include Ericsson’s Radio Dot System.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “T-Mobile and Ericsson have been infringing the ’171 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using T-Mobile’s LTE and 5G networks which include small cell wireless solutions such as Ericsson’s Radio Dot System.”

Plaintiff presented eleven claims for relief from alleged infringement of the patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory and injunctive relief along with an award of damages, ongoing royalties, and pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00414

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants

T-Mobile US, Inc.

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Ericsson Inc.

Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson

CommScope Holding Company, Inc.

Commscope, Inc.

CommScope Technologies LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cristofer Ivan Leffler

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Seattle

1200 Westlake Ave. N., Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Cliff Win, Jr.

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Seattle

1200 Westlake Ave. N., Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Joseph Michael Abraham

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Austin

13492 Research Blvd. Ste 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Stefan Szpajda

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Seattle

1200 Westlake Ave. N., Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Steven Thomas Skelley

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Seattle

1200 Westlake Ave. N., Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft, P.C.

7270 Crosswater Avenue, Suite B

Tyler, TX 75703

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Defendants' Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC, Commscope, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/14/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

#21

(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. CommScope Holding Company, Inc. served on 11/9/2022, answer due 12/15/2022. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond toPlaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/8/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

6 #6

Summons(es) T-Mobile USA, Inc.

6 #5

Summons(es) T-Mobile US, Inc.

6 #4

Summons(es) Ericsson Inc.

6 #2

Summons(es) CommScope Inc.

6 #1

Summons(es) CommScope Holding Company, Inc.

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Dali Systems Co. Ltd for Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CommScope Technologies LLC to 12/30/2022; CommScope Holding Company, Inc. to 12/30/2022; Commscope, Inc. to 12/30/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Defendants' Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC, Commscope, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/14/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. CommScope Holding Company, Inc. served on 11/9/2022, answer due 12/15/2022. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Ericsson Inc. to 2/13/2023; Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson to 2/13/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond toPlaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/8/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CommScope Technologies LLC to 12/15/2022; CommScope Holding Company, Inc. to 12/15/2022; Commscope, Inc. to 12/15/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cliff Win, Jr on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc. (Win, Cliff) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefan Szpajda on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc. (Szpajda, Stefan) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC, Commscope, Inc., Ericsson Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) CommScope Holding Company, Inc., #2 Summons(es) CommScope Inc., #3 Summons(es) CommScope Technologies LLC, #4 Summons(es) Ericsson Inc., #5 Summons(es) T-Mobile US, Inc., #6 Summons(es) T-Mobile USA, Inc.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Dali Systems Co. Ltd for Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC, Commscope, Inc., Ericsson Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9192657.), filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 10,750,382, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,197,358, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 11,026,232, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 10,334,499, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S.Patent No. 8,682,338, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 11,006,343, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 9,820,171, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DALI WIRELESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ERICSSON INC. is a litigant