This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2023 at 17:18:28 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Ericsson Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Dali Wireless, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ericsson Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01313

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants

Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc.

Verizon Online LLC

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexandra Fellowes

Defendant Attorneys

Ross Ritter Barton

Katherine Grayce Rubschlager

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#52

(#52) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#51

(#51) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#50

(#50) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #49 Stipulation of Dismissal (lad) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#49

(#49) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

48 #1

Proposed Order

#48

(#48) Joint MOTION to Extend Stay by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leffler, Cristofer) Modified on 6/15/2023 (lad). (Entered: 06/15/2023)

47 #1

Proposed Order

#47

(#47) Joint MOTION to Stay (Extend) by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#8

(#8) Opening Claim Construction Brief by Cellco Partnership, Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 12/8/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2023 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Joint Case Readiness Status Report by Dali Wireless, Inc. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#4

(#5) ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC.(bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Dali Wireless, Inc. by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson Inc..(bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#53) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#52) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#51) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#50) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #49 Stipulation of Dismissal (lad) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#49) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #48 Motion to Stay Case. On this date came for consideration the Joint Motion to Extend Stay. The Court is of the opinion that same should be GRANTED, and it is therefore ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Stay is GRANTED. This Action is therefore stayed for fourteen days. Parties are ORDERED to submit an amended scheduling order if dismissal papers are not filed in fourteen days. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (MSlc) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#48) Joint MOTION to Extend Stay by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leffler, Cristofer) Modified on 6/15/2023 (lad). (Entered: 06/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #47 Motion to Stay. Having considered the stipulation and finding good cause, the Court GRANTS the joint motion to stay and ORDERS that the stay is in place for 21 days, until June 15, 2023. If dismissal papers have not been entered by June 15th, parties are ORDERED to submit a joint status report within 5 days of the end of the stay. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (MSlc) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#47) Joint MOTION to Stay (Extend) by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders: #Order Regarding Court Docket Management and #Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure. Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Opposed MOTION to Sever and Motion to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Supplier Lawsuits by Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Opening Claim Construction Brief by Cellco Partnership, Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 12/8/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2023 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Joint Case Readiness Status Report by Dali Wireless, Inc. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Dali Wireless, Inc. by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson Inc..(bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC.(bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15656770) filed by Dali Wireless, Inc..(bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less