This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 00:21:57 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Corning Optical Communications LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Dali Wireless, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Corning Optical Communications LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06469

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DALI WIRELESS, INC.

Defendant

Corning Optical Communications LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Bailey King, Jr.

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

214 North Tryon Street, Suite 3700

Charlotte, NC 28202

David Douglas Schumann

1009 Erica Road

Mill Valley, CA 94941

J. Douglas Grimes

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

214 N. Tryon Street, Suite 3700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Michael C. Saunders

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

14512 Edgewater Lane, Ne

Seattle, WA 98155

Cristofer I. Leffler

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

14512 Edgewater Lane Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Brian A. E. Smith

Attorney at Bartko Zankel Bunzel & Miller

One Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph John Fraresso

Attorney at Bartko Zankel Bunzel & Miller

One Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alden K.W. Lee

Attorney at BARTKO ZANKEL BUNZEL & MILLER, APC

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph M. Abraham

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph M. Abraham, PLLC

13492 Research Blvd., Ste. 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Defendant Attorneys

Michael John Newton

Attorney at Alston & Bird

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Grayce Rubschlager

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

950 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Ross Ritter Barton

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

101 South Tryon Street, Suite 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Sang Lee

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

2828 North Harwood Street Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Sang Il Lee

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Caleb J Bean

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps and Phillips LLP

695 Town Center Drive, 14Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#68

#67

#66

#65

64 #1

Proposed Order

#64

#63

#62

#61

7 #3

Exhibit C - '454 Patent

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Complaint

#4

#3

1 #1

Exhibit A - '074 Patent

#1

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Stipulated E-Discovery Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #66 .(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb J Bean for Corning Optical Communications LLC (Bean, Caleb) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated E-Discovery Order filed by Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Newton, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #64 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Conduct Mediation. Parties shall have until 90 days after the Court issues its claim construction order to conduct mediation. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stiipulation to Extend the Deadline to Conduct Mediation filed by Corning Optical Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Stipulated Protective Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #62 .(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulated Protective Order filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Beth H. Parker as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION: Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/18/2021 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/4/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2020. Case referred to Private ADR. Claims Construction Hearing set 5/18/2021; Tutorial set 5/4/2021. Scheduling Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 7 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorneys: David Schumann, Brian Smith. Defendant Attorneys: Mike Newton, Ross Barton. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Corning Optical Communications LLC, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '261 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '358 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '454 Patent)(Grimes, J.) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice to Cristofer Leffler: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/15/2020. (mek) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Cristofer Leffler for Dali Wireless, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/8/2020. (mek) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cristofer Leffler Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4328064. by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Grimes, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (brj) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/2/2020) (brl). (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Corning Optical Communications LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DALI WIRELESS, INC. (Grimes, J.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Corning Optical Communications LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4316502), filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '074 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '766 Patent)(Grimes, J.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corning Optical Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian A. E. Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M. Abraham