This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2020 at 09:23:30 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Corning, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Dali Wireless, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Corning, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00827

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants

Corning, Inc.

Corning Optical Communications LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cristofer Leffler

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

14512 Edgewater Lane Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Joseph M. Abraham

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph M. Abraham, PLLC

13492 Research Blvd, Ste. 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Michael C. Saunders, II

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC

14512 Edgewarter Ln Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

David D. Schumann

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC

14512 Edgewater Ln Ne

Lake Forest Park, WA 98155

Defendant Attorneys

Sang Michael Lee

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Ross R. Barton

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

101 S. Tryon Street, Suite 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Michael J Newton

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit A

#19

18 #2

Exhibit

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

#14

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc. amending #1 Complaint, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(lad) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Dali Wireless, Inc's Corrected Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Its Amended Complaint and Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. After consideration of the motion, the Court is of the opinion that it should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk shall docket Plaintiff Dali Wireless, Inc's Amended Complaint (attached to the Motion as Exhibit 1), and that the deadline for Defendants Corning, Inc. and Corning Optical Communications LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Dali Wireless, Inc's Amended Complaint is 21 days from the entry of the Amended Complaint. In light of this order extending Defendants' responsive deadline, the portion of the Motion seeking an extension of same is moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORRECTED MOTION to Amend Complaint (Unopposed) by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Amend Complaint (Unopposed) by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Leffler, Cristofer) Terminated on 10/13/2020 following filing of #18 (lad). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Corning Optical Communications LLC answer due 11/6/2020; Corning, Inc. answer due 11/6/2020. (am) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendants have up to and including November 6, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 09/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Newton on behalf of Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc.. Attorney Michael J Newton added to party Corning Optical Communications LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Newton added to party Corning, Inc.(pty:dft) (Newton, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sang Michael Lee on behalf of Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc.. Attorney Sang Michael Lee added to party Corning Optical Communications LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sang Michael Lee added to party Corning, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lee, Sang) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross R. Barton on behalf of Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc.. Attorney Ross R. Barton added to party Corning Optical Communications LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ross R. Barton added to party Corning, Inc.(pty:dft) (Barton, Ross) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Corning, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cristofer Leffler on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc.. Attorney Cristofer Leffler added to party Dali Wireless, Inc.(pty:pla) (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Abraham, Joseph) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/10/2020) (lad). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Abraham for David D. Schumann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13949547) by on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Abraham for Michael C. Saunders II ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13949540) by on behalf of Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Abraham, Joseph) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/10/2020) (lad). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13949484). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abraham, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/10/2020) (lad). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corning Optical Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DALI WIRELESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Corning Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M. Abraham