This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2023 at 08:43:05 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Corning, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Dali Wireless, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Corning, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01314

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Verizon Online LLC

Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea L. Fair

Claire Abernathy Henry

Cliff Win, Jr.

Cristofer Leffler

David D. Schumann

Joseph M. Abraham

Palani Pradeep Rathinasamy

Stefan Szpajda

Timothy Franklin Dewberry

Defendant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Ross Ritter Barton

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#25

RESTRICTED

#24

(#24) ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 1/30/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

23 #2

Exhibit KK

23 #1

Exhibit JJ

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Corning Optical Communications LLC and Corning, Inc. by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Schumann, David) Modified on 1/18/2023 (lad). (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEVER AND GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#17

(#20) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc., re #17 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL 2-PAGE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF REGARDING THE "RADIO RESOURCES" TERM filed by Defendant Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC, Defendant Corning, Inc., Defendant Verizon Online LLC, Defendant Cellco Partnership, Defendant Verizon Online LLC, Defendant Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#9

Text Order MOOTING #9 Motion to Sever; MOOTING #9 Motion to Stay. In view of the parties' stipulation to sever the actions against the three manufacturer Defendants ECF No. #21 , the Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Sever for Misjoinder is MOOT. In view of the settlement of the claims between Dali and Defendant Corning ECF No. #22 , the Court finds Defendants' Motion to Sever and Stay Under the Customer-Suit Exception is MOOT with respect to Dali's claims against Verizon in this action. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#7

(#10) Opening Claim Construction Brief regarding #7 Claim Construction Brief by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 12/8/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Joint Case Readiness Status Report by Dali Wireless, Inc. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#4

(#4) ANSWER w/exhibits to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC.(bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER w/exhibits to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc.(bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#1

(#4) ANSWER w/exhibits to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC.(bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketText Order MOOTING #9 Motion to Sever; MOOTING #9 Motion to Stay. In view of the parties' stipulation to sever the actions against the three manufacturer Defendants ECF No. #21 , the Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Sever for Misjoinder is MOOT. In view of the settlement of the claims between Dali and Defendant Corning ECF No. #22 , the Court finds Defendants' Motion to Sever and Stay Under the Customer-Suit Exception is MOOT with respect to Dali's claims against Verizon in this action. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 1/30/2023. STATEMENTS AND ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEARD, WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 1/30/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF REGARDING THE RADIO RESOURCES TERM by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JJ, #2 Exhibit KK)(lad) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to File. Because the Court finds that good cause exists to allow Defendants to file a 2-page supplemental brief, the Court GRANTS the Motion. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a responsive 2-page supplemental brief by January 26, 2023. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Corning Optical Communications LLC and Corning, Inc. by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Schumann, David) Modified on 1/18/2023 (lad). (Entered: 01/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase severed from original case 6:22-CV-104 per document #21 . (bw) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEVER AND GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc., re #17 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL 2-PAGE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF REGARDING THE "RADIO RESOURCES" TERM filed by Defendant Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Defendant Corning Optical Communications LLC, Defendant Corning, Inc., Defendant Verizon Online LLC, Defendant Cellco Partnership, Defendant Verizon Online LLC, Defendant Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Opening Claim Construction Brief regarding #7 Claim Construction Brief by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Opposed MOTION to Sever Defendants Opposed Motion to Sever and Motion to Stay Pending Final Resolution of Supplier Lawsuits by Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Opening Claim Construction Brief by Cellco Partnership, Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC with exhibits included. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 12/8/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Joint Case Readiness Status Report by Dali Wireless, Inc. (bw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER w/exhibits to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC.(bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER w/exhibits to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc.(bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT w/Civil Cover Sheet ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15656770) filed by Dali Wireless, Inc..(bw) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less