This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2023 at 08:19:25 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Cellco Partnership, et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Dali Wireless, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cellco Partnership,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Schroeder, III and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc

Verizon Online LLC

CommScope Holding Company, Inc.

Commscope Inc.

CommScope Technologies LLC

Not Classified By Court

Michael D. Paul

San Antonio, TX 78260-8041

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Franklin Dewberry

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Austin

13492 Research Blvd. Ste 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Cliff Win, Jr.

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Seattle

1200 Westlake Ave. N., Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

David D. Schumann

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

1200 Westlake Ave N., Ste. 809

Seattle, WA 98101

Joseph M. Abraham

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

13492 Research Blvd, Ste. 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Palani Pradeep Rathinasamy

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

1200 Westlake Ave N, Ste. 809

Seattle, WA 98144

Stefan Szpajda

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Seattle

1200 Westlake Ave. N., Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Cristofer Leffler

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

1200 Westlake Ave. N., Ste 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Joseph Michael Abraham

Attorney at Folio Law Group, PLLC - Austin

13492 Research Blvd. Ste 120, No. 177

Austin, TX 78750

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ross Ritter Barton

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP-NC

101 South Tryon Street, Ste 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft, P.C.

7270 Crosswater Avenue, Suite B

Tyler, TX 75703

Christopher R. Johnson

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP

3600 North Capital Of Texas Hwy

Eric H. Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft, P.C.

102 N. College Ave., Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Roger Brian Craft

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

107 #5

Exhibit E

107 #4

Exhibit D

107 #3

Exhibit C

107 #2

Exhibit B

107 #1

Exhibit A

#107

(#107) OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#106

(#106) ORDER SUBSTITUTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/1/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#105

(#105) NOTICE by Dali Wireless, Inc. re #103 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Notice Concerning Combined Claim Construction (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#103

(#103) ORDER re #102 Joint Notice Concerning Consolidation. After reviewing the notice, it appears that consolidation is not proper. Accordingly, the parties are advised that the claim construction hearing in Case No. 2:23-cv-00002 will occur jointly with the claim construction hearing in Case No. 2:22-cv-00012 (the AT&T litigation. (Markman Hearing set for 4/27/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne in both cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/2/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to CommScope Technologies LLC. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to CommScope Inc. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Leffler, Cristofer) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dali Systems Co. Ltd. for Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

284 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) ORDER SUBSTITUTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/1/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 4/25/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) NOTICE by Dali Wireless, Inc. re #103 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Notice Concerning Combined Claim Construction (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Joint Claim Construction Statement by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Win, Cliff) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) ORDER re #102 Joint Notice Concerning Consolidation. After reviewing the notice, it appears that consolidation is not proper. Accordingly, the parties are advised that the claim construction hearing in Case No. 2:23-cv-00002 will occur jointly with the claim construction hearing in Case No. 2:22-cv-00012 (the AT&T litigation. (Markman Hearing set for 4/27/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne in both cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/2/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE by Dali Wireless, Inc. Joint Notice Concerning Consolidation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) ORDER granting #100 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Joint Notice Concerning Consolidation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/25/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Joint Notice Concerning Consolidation by Cellco Partnership, CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC, Commscope Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc, Verizon Online LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER granting #98 Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Joint Notice Concerning Consolidation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/18/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to CommScope Technologies LLC. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to CommScope Inc. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (zv) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Leffler, Cristofer) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dali Systems Co. Ltd. for Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15656770). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leffler, Cristofer) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/4/2023.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less