This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2022 at 08:37:29 (UTC).

Dali Wireless, Inc. v. Cellco Partnership, et al

Case Summary

On January 27, 2022, Dali Wireless, Inc. (“Dali” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Cristofer Leffler of Folio Law Group PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Cellco Partnership D/B/A Verizon Wireless; Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc.; Verizon Online LLC (collectively, “Verizon”); CommScope Holding Company, Inc.; CommScope Inc.; CommScope Technologies LLC (collectively, “CommScope”); and others (collectively, “Defendants”) seeking injunctive relief, damages and ongoing royalties, among other reliefs, for the Defendants’ alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent Nos. 11,026,232 (the “’232 patent”); 10,334,499 (the “’499 patent”); 11,006,343 (the “’343 patent”); and 8,682,338 (the “’338 patent”) (collectively referred to as the “Patents-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff. 

In the complaint the Plaintiff alleged that, “Verizon has been infringing the ’232 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using CommScope’s ION®-E/ERA platform1 in its LTE and 5G networks. CommScope has also been infringing the ’232 patent through use of its ION®-E/ERA platform both in Verizon’s LTE and 5G networks and in connection with CommScope’s course-of-business operations.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Verizon has been infringing the ’232 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using Ericsson’s Radio Dot system2 in its LTE and 5G networks. Ericsson has also been infringing the ’232 patent through use of its Radio Dot system both in Verizon’s LTE and 5G networks and in connection with Ericsson’s course-ofbusines operations.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “On information and belief, Verizon has infringed and continues to infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims, including at least claim 12, of the ’232 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271, et seq., by deploying, operating, maintaining, testing, and using Verizon’s LTE and 5G networks which include CommScope’s ION®-E/ERA platform.”

There are thirteen claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which deal with the alleged infringement of the Patents owned by the Plaintiff.

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for an award of permanent injunctive relief and damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284, together with any post-judgment ongoing royalties under 35 U.S.C. § 284 as may be appropriate, together with pre- and post-judgment interests and such other relief at law or in equity as the Court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dali Wireless, Inc.

Defendants

Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc.

Verizon Online LLC

CommScope Holding Company, Inc.

CommScope Inc.

CommScope Technologies LLC

Ericsson Inc.

Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson

Corning, Inc.

Corning Optical Communications LLC

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David D. Schumann

Joseph M. Abraham

Stefan Szpajda

Steven T. Skelley

Timothy Franklin Dewberry

Cristofer Leffler

Cliff Win, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Eric H. Findlay

Brian Craft

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC re #1 Complaint (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC re #1 Complaint (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#24

(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. Verizon Online LLC served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#23

(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc. served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#22

(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. CommScope Inc. served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

16 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

03/10/2022

DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Cellco Partnership answer due 4/11/2022; Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc. answer due 4/11/2022; Verizon Online LLC answer due 4/11/2022. (bw) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc., Verizon Online LLC re #1 Complaint (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: Corning Optical Communications LLC and Corning, Inc. answer due 4/14/2022. (zv) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Inc., and CommScope Technologies LLC answer due 4/14/2022. (zv) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Corning Optical Communications LLC, Corning, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by CommScope Holding Company, Inc., CommScope Inc., CommScope Technologies LLC re #1 Complaint (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. Verizon Online LLC served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. Verizon Corporate Services Group, Inc. served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. CommScope Inc. served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Abraham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
View All Docket Entries
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to CommScope Technologies LLC. (zv) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to CommScope Inc. (zv) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CommScope Holding Company, Inc. (zv) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (zv) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2022

DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dali Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dali Systems Co. Ltd. for Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15656770). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dali Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leffler, Cristofer) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less