This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2022 at 08:43:17 (UTC).

D'Alessandro v. Trinity Services Group

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 D'Alessandro filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Trinity Services Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph L. D'Alessandro

Live Oak, FL 32060

Defendant

Trinity Services Group

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Trinity Services Group with Jury Demand filed by Joseph L. D'Alessandro. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph L. D'Alessandro. (LD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall, within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this order, either pay the required $402.00 filing fee or properly complete and return "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/1/2022. (KMG) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall, within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this order, either pay the required $402.00 filing fee or properly complete and return "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/1/2022. (KMG) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph L. D'Alessandro. (LD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Trinity Services Group with Jury Demand filed by Joseph L. D'Alessandro. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. is a litigant