Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2020 at 10:24:54 (UTC).

Daise v. E & J Gallo Winery, et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Daise filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against E J Gallo Winery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00908

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latisha Daise

Defendants

E & J Gallo Winery

Katharine Eloise Mercer

E&J Gallo Winery, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Austin Tyler Brown

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorney

Chase Ellis Hattaway

Attorney at Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, PA

300 S Orange Ave Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Joint NOTICE of Proposal for Settlement upon Defendants, Katherine Eloise Mercer and E&J Gallo Winery, Inc by Latisha Daise (Brown, Austin) Modified docket text on 10/8/2020 (KEM). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER DENYING #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/6/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

17 #3

Exhibit C Medical Cost Projection

17 #2

Exhibit B Plaintiff Answers to Interrogatories

17 #1

Exhibit A Plaintiff Rsp to Request for Admissions

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiff Rsp to Request for Admissions, #2 Exhibit B Plaintiff Answers to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C Medical Cost Projection)(Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

16 #2

Docket Sheets

16 #1

Mediation Report Form

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 7/1/2021; Discovery due by 7/1/2021; Dispositive motions due by 8/2/2021; Pretrial statement due by 11/10/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 12/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer identifying Corporate Parent E&J Gallo Winery, Corporate Parent Dry Creek Corporation for E&J Gallo Winery, Inc... (Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer. Related case(s): yes (Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by Latisha Daise. (Brown, Austin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Latisha Daise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Austin) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

9 #2

Consent Letter and Form

9 #1

Case Management Report Form

#9

(#9) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint NOTICE of Proposal for Settlement upon Defendants, Katherine Eloise Mercer and E&J Gallo Winery, Inc by Latisha Daise (Brown, Austin) Modified docket text on 10/8/2020 (KEM). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER DENYING #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/6/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiff Rsp to Request for Admissions, #2 Exhibit B Plaintiff Answers to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C Medical Cost Projection)(Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 7/1/2021; Discovery due by 7/1/2021; Dispositive motions due by 8/2/2021; Pretrial statement due by 11/10/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 12/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer identifying Corporate Parent E&J Gallo Winery, Corporate Parent Dry Creek Corporation for E&J Gallo Winery, Inc... (Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer. Related case(s): yes (Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by Latisha Daise. (Brown, Austin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Latisha Daise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Austin) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER: #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Set for Jury Trial is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The parties shall comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules.. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/31/2020. (CKS) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED document by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order filed by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing Defendant E&J Gallo Winery, Inc. to remedy the jurisdictional deficiencies noted in this order on or before August 31, 2020, or this case will be remanded. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/14/2020. (AMP) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to set for Jury Trial by Latisha Daise. (AEJ) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer. (filed in State Court on 6/17/2020)(AEJ) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 5/26/2020) against E&J Gallo Winery, Inc., Katharine Eloise Mercer with Jury Demand filed by Latisha Daise.(AEJ) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-908-J-39PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 16-2020-CA-2976 filed in State Court on May 26, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17173211 filed by E & J Gallo Winery. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Pending Motions, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit A State Court Documents, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hattaway, Chase) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E. & J. Gallo Winery is a litigant