On March 24, 2023, Daingean Technologies Ltd. (“Plaintiff”), represented by Alden Harris, Amir H. Alavi, Demetrios Anaipakos, and Michael McBride of Alavi & Anaipakos, PLLC; Michael Heim, Eric Enger, R. Allan Bullwinkel, Alden Harris, Blaine Larson of Heim Payne & Chorush LLP; and Andrea L. Fair of Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against AT&T Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility II LLC, and AT&T Services Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for alleged patent infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.
In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “AT&T operates what it calls its 5G and 5G+ networks. The AT&T 5G Networks “cover 230M Americans in 14,000 cities and towns and AT&T 5G+ is now available in parts of 38 cities in the U.S.”
Plaintiff also stated that “AT&T provides more than 100 million U.S. consumers with communications and entertainment experiences across mobile and broadband.”
The plaintiff then alleged, “’AT&T Communications generated 2022 revenues of $117.1 billion. AT&T’s 5G Networks cover nearly 288 million people across the United States.’”
Plaintiff additionally alleged, “5G+ is available in select innovation zones and venues in over 20 states across the US. According to AT&T, 5G is one of ‘two key areas of focus’ for the company.”
Plaintiff further alleged, “The ’803 Patent was assigned to Daingean by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation on August 23, 2022.”
The plaintiff also alleged, “AT&T has infringed directly and continues to infringe directly the ’803 Patent in its implementation of AT&T’s 5G Networks. The infringing activities include, but are not limited to, the manufacture, use, sale, importation, and/or offer for sale of products and/or services from AT&T for operation on its 5G Networks”
The plaintiff then alleged, “The ’976 Patent is generally directed toward uplink transmission management to address latency and reliability requirements and potential coexistence issues.”
Plaintiff additionally alleged, “AT&T has infringed directly and continues to infringe directly the ’976 Patent in its implementation of its 5G network.”
The plaintiff further alleged, “Daingean holds all rights, title, and interest in and to the ’958 Patent, including the right to bring this suit and recover all past, present and future damages for infringement of the ’958 Patent.”
The plaintiff also alleged, “AT&T has infringed directly and continues to infringe directly the ’958 Patent. The infringing acts include, but are not limited to, the manufacture, use, sale, importation, and/or offer for sale of products and/or services from AT&T that practice or implement the asserted claims, including for example, wireless network devices that generate, transmit, and/or receive the claimed SIB blocks and associated information.”
Plaintiff presented six claims for relief from alleged infringement of the patents-in-suit.
In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory relief and an award of damages with pre- and post-judgment interest.
This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.
2:23-CV-00123
03/24/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Roy S. Payne
Rodney Gilstrap
Daingean Technologies Ltd.
AT&T Corp.
AT&T Mobility LLC
AT&T Mobility II LLC
AT&T Services Inc.
Ericsson Inc.
Nokia of America Corporation
Ericsson Inc.
Nokia of America Corporation
Demetrios Anaipakos
Andrea Leigh Fair
Blaine Andrew Larson
Eric James Enger
Robert Allan Bullwinkel
Michael F Heim
Alden Harris
Amir H. Alavi
Michael Dean McBride
Alexander Jefferson Chern
Joshua Wright Budwin
Warren Henry Lipschitz
Eric Sorensen Hansen
Matthew T. Cameron
Deron R Dacus
Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Nicholas M Mathews
(#63) PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #56 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
(#62) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Hansen, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
(#61) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Jefferson Chern on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Chern, Alexander) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
(#60) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T. Cameron on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Cameron, Matthew) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
(#59) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Wright Budwin on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Budwin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
(#58) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Henry Lipschitz on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Lipschitz, Warren) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
(#57) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Nokia of America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Solutions and Networks B.V., Other Affiliate Nokia Corporation, Other Affiliate Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy for Nokia of America Corporation. (Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
(#56) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by Nokia of America Corporation.(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
(#55) ORDER granting #54 Motion to Intervene. Accordingly, Nokia is permitted to intervene as a defendant in this action and is GRANTED LEAVE to promptly file its responsive pleading in intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/25/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
Exhibit F
Exhibit E
Exhibit D
Exhibit C
Exhibit B
Exhibit A
Civil Cover Sheet
(#56) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by Nokia of America Corporation.(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
Docket(#63) PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #56 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#62) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Hansen, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#61) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Jefferson Chern on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Chern, Alexander) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#60) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T. Cameron on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Cameron, Matthew) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#59) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Wright Budwin on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Budwin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#58) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Henry Lipschitz on behalf of AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation (Lipschitz, Warren) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#57) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Nokia of America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Solutions and Networks B.V., Other Affiliate Nokia Corporation, Other Affiliate Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy for Nokia of America Corporation. (Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#56) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Daingean Technologies Ltd. by Nokia of America Corporation.(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/29/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#55) ORDER granting #54 Motion to Intervene. Accordingly, Nokia is permitted to intervene as a defendant in this action and is GRANTED LEAVE to promptly file its responsive pleading in intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/25/2023. (daj, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#54) Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9419697.), filed by Daingean Technologies ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
[-] Read Less