This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2023 at 06:41:46 (UTC).

Daingean Technologies Ltd. v. AT&T Inc. et al

Case Summary

On March 24, 2023, Daingean Technologies Ltd. (“Plaintiff”), represented by Alden Harris, Amir H. Alavi, Demetrios Anaipakos, and Michael McBride of Alavi & Anaipakos, PLLC; Michael Heim, Eric Enger, R. Allan Bullwinkel, Alden Harris, Blaine Larson of Heim Payne & Chorush LLP; and Andrea L. Fair of Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against AT&T Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility II LLC, and AT&T Services Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for alleged patent infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “AT&T operates what it calls its 5G and 5G+ networks. The AT&T 5G Networks “cover 230M Americans in 14,000 cities and towns and AT&T 5G+ is now available in parts of 38 cities in the U.S.”

Plaintiff also stated that “AT&T provides more than 100 million U.S. consumers with communications and entertainment experiences across mobile and broadband.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “’AT&T Communications generated 2022 revenues of $117.1 billion. AT&T’s 5G Networks cover nearly 288 million people across the United States.’”

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “5G+ is available in select innovation zones and venues in over 20 states across the US. According to AT&T, 5G is one of ‘two key areas of focus’ for the company.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “The ’803 Patent was assigned to Daingean by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation on August 23, 2022.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “AT&T has infringed directly and continues to infringe directly the ’803 Patent in its implementation of AT&T’s 5G Networks. The infringing activities include, but are not limited to, the manufacture, use, sale, importation, and/or offer for sale of products and/or services from AT&T for operation on its 5G Networks”

The plaintiff then alleged, “The ’976 Patent is generally directed toward uplink transmission management to address latency and reliability requirements and potential coexistence issues.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “AT&T has infringed directly and continues to infringe directly the ’976 Patent in its implementation of its 5G network.” 

The plaintiff further alleged, “Daingean holds all rights, title, and interest in and to the ’958 Patent, including the right to bring this suit and recover all past, present and future damages for infringement of the ’958 Patent.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “AT&T has infringed directly and continues to infringe directly the ’958 Patent. The infringing acts include, but are not limited to, the manufacture, use, sale, importation, and/or offer for sale of products and/or services from AT&T that practice or implement the asserted claims, including for example, wireless network devices that generate, transmit, and/or receive the claimed SIB blocks and associated information.”

Plaintiff presented six claims for relief from alleged infringement of the patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory relief and an award of damages with pre- and post-judgment interest. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Daingean Technologies Ltd.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

AT&T Corp.

AT&T Mobility LLC

AT&T Mobility II LLC

AT&T Services Inc.

Ericsson Inc.

Nokia of America Corporation

Intervenors and Counter Claimants

Ericsson Inc.

Nokia of America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Leigh Fair

Demetrios Anaipakos

Blaine Andrew Larson

Eric James Enger

Robert Allan Bullwinkel

Michael F Heim

Alden Harris

Amir H. Alavi

Michael Dean McBride

Michael Dunbar

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Intervenor Attorneys

Alexander Jefferson Chern

Deron R Dacus

Eric Sorensen Hansen

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Joshua Wright Budwin

Matthew T. Cameron

Warren Henry Lipschitz

Nicholas M Mathews

 

Court Documents

#77

(#77) ORDER granting #68 Motion for Issuance of Letter Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to Hague Convention; granting #69 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting #70 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/26/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

70 #2

Proposed Order

70 #1

Exhibit A

#70

(#70) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

69 #2

Proposed Order

69 #1

Exhibit A

68 #2

Proposed Order

68 #1

Exhibit A

#68

(#68) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to Hague Convention by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9419697.), filed by Daingean Technologies ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#77) ORDER granting #68 Motion for Issuance of Letter Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to Hague Convention; granting #69 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting #70 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/26/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#76) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dunbar on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Dunbar, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#75) PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #67 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#74) PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #66 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#73) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Ericsson Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#72) PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #65 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Daingean Technologies Ltd..(Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#71) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Nokia of America Corporation (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#70) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#69) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#68) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to Hague Convention by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Larson, Blaine) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric James Enger on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Enger, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Daingean Technologies Ltd. (Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9419697.), filed by Daingean Technologies ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Heim, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less