This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2019 at 07:11:09 (UTC).

Dailida et al v. Recovery Zone, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Dailida filed an Other lawsuit against Recovery Zone, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-30065

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melissa Dailida

Anthony Dailida

Defendants

Santander Consumer USA, Inc. d/b/a Chrysler Capital

Recovery Zone, Inc.

Santander Consumer USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sebastian N. Korth

Attorney at Korth Law Office

12 Maple Street

Ludlow, MA 01056

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph M. Noone

Attorney at Avery Dooley & Noone, LLP

3 Brighton Street

Belmont, MA 02478

Michael T. Grant

Attorney at LeClair Ryan, P.C.

60 State Street, 23Rd Flr.

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Korth, Sebastian) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Grant, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Grant on behalf of Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Grant, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Noone on behalf of Recovery Zone, Inc. (Noone, Joseph) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Recovery Zone, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Korth, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#5

(#5) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Recovery Zone, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Recovery Zone, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

1 #2

Case Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7677016 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anthony Dailida, Melissa Dailida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Category Sheet)(Korth, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Korth, Sebastian) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bartlett, Timothy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Grant, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Grant on behalf of Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Grant, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Noone on behalf of Recovery Zone, Inc. (Noone, Joseph) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Recovery Zone, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Korth, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Recovery Zone, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Recovery Zone, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7677016 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anthony Dailida, Melissa Dailida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Category Sheet)(Korth, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.