This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 06:56:02 (UTC).

Daida v. Zinus, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Daida filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Zinus, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall J. Newman and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01619

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Daida

Defendant

Zinus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Betsy Carol Manifold

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

750 B Street, Suite 1820

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Consent Form

3 #2

Order re Filing Requirements

3 #3

VDRP

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Zinus, Inc. on 8/17/2020, Answer due 10/16/2020 (Manifold, Betsy) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Zinus, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Betsy Carol Manifold* *Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP* *750 B Street, Suite 1820* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zinus, Inc. by Chris Daida. Attorney Manifold, Betsy Carol added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9050917) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manifold, Betsy) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zinus, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Betsy C. Manifold