This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 14:11:51 (UTC).

Dai et. al. v. Tencent Holdings Limited et. al.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Dai filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Tencent Holdings Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02201

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Xuefeng Dai

New York, NY 10007

Khan Funds Management America, Inc.

Defendants

Pony Huateng, MA

Chao Li

Tencent Holdings Limited

Robin Yanhong, LI

TENCENT AMERICA LLC

BAIDU USA LLC

Baidu, Inc.

Robin Yanhong Li

Pony Huateng Ma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph J Sullivan, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph Sullivan, PLLC

40 Wall Street, Ste 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Brian Patrick Fredericks

Attorney at Law Office of Brian P. Fredericks, P.C.

1330 Avenue Of The Americas, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Xuefeng Dai

One World Trade Center, Suite 83

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorneys

Jay L. Pomerantz

Attorney at Fenwick & West

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Michael Carl Tu

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5855

Thomas Nill Kidera

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Xiang Wang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

William Joseph Foley, Jr.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

22 #2

Consent to Substitution of Counsel

22 #1

Cover Letter

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

4 #2

Certificates of Good Standing

4 #1

Declaration

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C - March 22, 2019 Amended Summonses and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - March 15, 2019 Amended Summonses and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Tencent's Consent and Joinder

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/4/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order re: Notice of Consent to Change Attorney - Attorney Xuefeng Dai for Xuefeng Dai, Xuefeng Dai for Khan Funds Management America, Inc. added. Attorney Joseph J Sullivan, III terminated. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/4/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xuefeng Dai (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Consent to Substitution of Counsel) (Sullivan, Joseph) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Letter to Brian Patrick Fredericks re Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint by Pony Huateng Ma (Pomerantz, Jay) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter pursuant to Rule 4(B) of the Court's Individual Motion Practices and Rules indicating service of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Baidu, Inc., Robin Yanhong Li (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File: The application is granted. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 7/11/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint so as to Allow Alignment of Briefing Schedules for All Defendants by Baidu, Inc., Robin Yanhong Li. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #18 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The conference is adjourned to 12/4/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 at the Central Islip Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/19/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference initial conference by Khan Funds Management America, Inc.. (Sullivan, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J Sullivan, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/20/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon all defendants who have not appeared in this action to date and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baidu USA LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Kidera, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11388818. by Baidu USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wang, Xiang) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11387336. by Baidu USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (Tu, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baidu USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Baidu Japan Inc. for Baidu USA LLC. (Kidera, Thomas) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Baidu USA LLC (Kidera, Thomas) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Baidu USA LLC from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 616024/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11386707). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tencent's Consent and Joinder, #2 Exhibit B - March 15, 2019 Amended Summonses and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - March 22, 2019 Amended Summonses and Complaint) (Kidera, Thomas) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baidu, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tencent America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tencent Holdings Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C. Tu