This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:34:14 (UTC).

Dague v. LoanCare LLC.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Dague filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against LoanCare LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03175

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Herman Dague

Defendant

LoanCare LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perry C. Thompson

Attorney at Horenstein, Nicholson, & Blumenthal LPA

124 E. Third St., 5Th Floor

Dayton, OH 45402

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin D Carnahan

Attorney at Dinn Hochman & Potter, LLC

5910 Landerbrook Drive, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44124

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time in Which to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant LoanCare LLC.. (Carnahan, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to LoanCare LLC. on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Thompson, Perry) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D Carnahan for Defendant LoanCare LLC. (Carnahan, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset deadlines pursuant to #4 : Answer due 10/10/2019. (ew) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION for Extension of Time in Which to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant LoanCare LLC.. (Carnahan, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to LoanCare LLC. on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Thompson, Perry) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D Carnahan for Defendant LoanCare LLC. (Carnahan, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against LoanCare LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7022829), filed by Herman Dague. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Perry) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less