This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/16/2019 at 07:14:00 (UTC).

Daehan Trading Inc. et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Daehan Trading Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08945

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The 2009 Yang Family Trust dtd

Daehan Trading Inc.

Defendants

The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Does 1 through 10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason T Yoon

Jason J Kim

Kevin Hyunjong Hong

John Yunhwan Kim

Defendant Attorneys

Randy M McElvain

David S Song

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Declaration of Song ISO Removal

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

12/05/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Song, David) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08945 VAP(SKx). (rn) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America answer now due 11/22/2019; The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut answer now due 11/22/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America; The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Song, David) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Daehan Trading Inc., The 2009 Yang Family Trust dtd 03/06/2009. Filed in State Court on 9/13/19 Submitted with notice of removal #1 (car) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (McElvain, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Daehan Trading, Inc. (Plaintiff); The 2009 Yang Family Trust DTD 03/06/2009 (Plaintiff); The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut (Defendant); Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Defendant); and The Travelers Companies, Inc. (parent company). (McElvain, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (McElvain, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV32648 Receipt No: 0973-24621568 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Song ISO Removal) (Attorney Randy M McElvain added to party The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut(pty:dft), Attorney Randy M McElvain added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(McElvain, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less