This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2022 at 07:35:30 (UTC).

DADLES v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 DADLES filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01400

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICKI DADLES

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

COSMETIC TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELLE A. PARFITT

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1825 K Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

John Chadwick Coots

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON, L.L.P.

1155 F Street, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

9 #1

*Restricted*

9 #9

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#8

(#8) EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-277), dated 3/15/2022, from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2738) (ztnr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit

4 #4

Main Document

3 #1

Notice and Consent

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by VICKI DADLES. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-1978 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

1 #4

Summons Personal Care Products Council

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, ) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-02666. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-277), dated 3/15/2022, from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2738) (ztnr) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions to MDL 2738 by PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Locke, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the February 18, 2022 Status Conference and pursuant to the agreement of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that leave is granted for Defendant Personal Care Products Council to file a Notice of Related Actions with the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and request that this and other related actions be transferred to the U.S. District Court for New Jersey. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/18/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on February 18, 2022 at 11:30 am. Dial-in information has been provided by email. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/13/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmw) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by VICKI DADLES. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-1978 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8794144) filed by VICKI DADLES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant