This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2023 at 07:32:39 (UTC).

Da Camara v. Poshmark, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Da Camara filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Poshmark, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-07379

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Suzanne Da Camara

Defendants

Poshmark, Inc.

Manish Chandra

Navin Chaddha

Ebony Beckwith

Jeff Epstein

Jenny Ming

Hans Tung

Serena J. Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Evan Jason Smith

Attorney at Brodsky & Smith LLC

9595 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 900

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Ryan P. Cardona

Attorney at Brodsky & Smith

9595 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 900

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ebony Beckwith, Navin Chaddha, Manish Chandra, Jeff Epstein, Jenny Ming, Poshmark, Inc., Hans Tung, Serena J. Williams ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17750146.). Filed bySuzanne Da Camara. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Suzanne Da Camara . (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Suzanne Da Camara (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Suzanne Da Camara (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2023 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Ebony Beckwith, Navin Chaddha, Manish Chandra, Jeff Epstein, Jenny Ming, Poshmark, Inc., Hans Tung, Serena J. Williams. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Suzanne Da Camara.. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2023. Parties may download Judge Alsup's standing orders from the Court's webpage: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/alsup-william-wha/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Suzanne Da Camara.. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. The County Code in the case opening screen has been corrected to 'US, Outside State' and not San Mateo as it refers to plaintiff's coun ty of residence. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Suzanne Da Camara. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Ebony Beckwith, Navin Chaddha, Manish Chandra, Jeff Epstein, Jenny Ming, Poshmark, Inc., Hans Tung, Serena J. Williams. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2023 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Suzanne Da Camara (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Suzanne Da Camara (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Suzanne Da Camara . (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ebony Beckwith, Navin Chaddha, Manish Chandra, Jeff Epstein, Jenny Ming, Poshmark, Inc., Hans Tung, Serena J. Williams ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17750146.). Filed bySuzanne Da Camara. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Poshmark, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan P Cardona