This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2021 at 12:35:52 (UTC).

D. v. United Healthcare Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 D filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Shelby and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00121

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Shelby

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L. D.

Defendants

United Healthcare Insurance

United Behavioral Health

Insperity Group Health Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/27/21. (dla) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Insperity Group Health Plan, United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4099205) filed by L. D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (King, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff L. D. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/27/21. (dla) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/24/2021. (mjm) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel for the Plaintiff e-filed Complaint, Cover Sheet and paid on 09/01/2021. Correction: File date changed to 09/01/2021 when the court had jurisdiction. re #2 Complaint. (mh) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Insperity Group Health Plan, United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4099205) filed by L. D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (King, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff L. D. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant