This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2022 at 09:57:14 (UTC).

D. et al v. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 D filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M. D.

J. D.

Defendant

Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorney

Nathan R. Marigoni

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

600 Peachtree St Ne Ste 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiffs J. D., M. D. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/28/2022. (jwt) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by M. D., J. D. as to Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield Waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Plaintiffs J. D., M. D.. Form due by 8/10/2022. (mh) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket(#7) The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties failed to file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket(#6) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs J. D., M. D.. (mh) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Plaintiffs J. D., M. D.. Form due by 8/10/2022. (mh) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by M. D., J. D. as to Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield Waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/28/2022. (jwt) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4375994) filed by M. D., J. D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiffs J. D., M. D. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan R. Marigoni