Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 11:01:53 (UTC).

Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB et al v. JSR Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Cytiva BioProcess R D AB filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against JSR Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00310

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cytiva Sweden AB

Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB

Defendants

JSR Micro NV

JSR Corporation

JSR Life Sciences, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Governing Service of Process and Response Time to Complaint by Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB, Cytiva Sweden AB. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB: For JSR Micro NV waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB: For JSR Corporation waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB. JSR Life Sciences, LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Danaher Corporation for Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB, Cytiva Sweden AB filed by Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB, Cytiva Sweden AB. (nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,213,765; 10,343,142; 10,875,007. (nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against JSR Corporation, JSR Life Sciences, LLC, JSR Micro NV - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3550991.) - filed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 Stipulation and Proposed Order Governing Service of Process and Response Time to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: JSR Corporation answer due 6/1/2021; JSR Life Sciences, LLC answer due 6/1/2021; JSR Micro NV answer due 6/1/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/12/2021. (nms) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Governing Service of Process and Response Time to Complaint by Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB, Cytiva Sweden AB. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB: For JSR Micro NV waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB: For JSR Corporation waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB. JSR Life Sciences, LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Danaher Corporation for Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB, Cytiva Sweden AB filed by Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB, Cytiva Sweden AB. (nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,213,765; 10,343,142; 10,875,007. (nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against JSR Corporation, JSR Life Sciences, LLC, JSR Micro NV - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3550991.) - filed by Cytiva Sweden AB, Cytiva BioProcess R&D AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandra M. Joyce