This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2020 at 08:13:45 (UTC).

Cynthia Beaupre et al v. ATOS Medical Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Cynthia Beaupre filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ATOS Medical Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01600

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Beaupre

Petitioner

DOES 1 though 25, inclusive

Defendants

ATOS Medical Inc

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maria Esther Garcia

Attorney at Eldessouky Law APC

17139 Bellflower Boulevard Suite 202

Bellflower, CA 90706

Mohamed Ahmed Eldessouky

Attorney at Eldessouky Law APC

17139 Bellflower Boulevard Suite 202

Bellflower, CA 90706

Defendant Attorneys

Clarisse Casanova Petersen

Attorney at Jackson Lewis

200 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92618

Monica H Bullock

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

200 Specterum Center Drive Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92679

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

CV-11C

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Wage Statements

1 #6

Declaration Lori Rauth

1 #5

Exhibit D - Notice to Superior Court of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - State Court Docket

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, and Accompanying Documents

1 #1

Declaration Clarisse C. Petersen

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:20-cv-01600 DSF(SHKx). (rn) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ATOS Medical Inc, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 served on August 12, 2020. (Petersen, Clarisse) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant ATOS Medical Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants ATOS Medical Inc, Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Beaupre. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/1/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ATOS Medical Inc, identifying Cynthia Beaupre, Atos Medical Inc, and Atos Medical AB. (Petersen, Clarisse) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ATOS Medical Inc identifying Atos Medical AB as Corporate Parent. (Petersen, Clarisse) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ATOS Medical Inc. (Petersen, Clarisse) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number MCC2001018 Receipt No: BCACDC-27567632 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ATOS Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Clarisse C. Petersen, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, and Accompanying Documents, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Notice to Superior Court of Removal, #6 Declaration Lori Rauth, #7 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Wage Statements) (Attorney Clarisse Casanova Petersen added to party ATOS Medical Inc(pty:dft))(Petersen, Clarisse) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clarisse Casanova Petersen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica Hartman Bullock