This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2021 at 09:28:53 (UTC).

Cyeef-Din et al v. Onken et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Cyeef-Din filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Onken. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar and Laura Fashing. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00133

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Quan Tran

Abdul Wakil Cyeef-Din

Defendants

Dylan Glenn

Brian Martinez

Jason Fleming

Aaron Brown

Aaron Brick

Nicholas Onken

Jonathan Hickerson

Arion Hayes

Lance Romero

Patrick Roberson

James LaPorte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam C. Flores

Attorney at Kennedy, Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorney

Christina L Brennan

Attorney at Brennan & Sullivan PA

128 East Devargas

Santa Fe, NM 87501

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 13 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,, filed by Aaron Brown, Nicholas Onken, Jonathan Hickerson, Aaron Brick, Lance Romero, Arion Hayes, Patrick Roberson, Jason Fleming, Dylan Glenn, Brian Martinez, James LaPorte, 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,, filed by Aaron Brown, Nicholas Onken, Jonathan Hickerson, Lance Romero, Arion Hayes, Patrick Roberson, Jason Fleming, Brian Martinez, James LaPorte, 15 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Quan Tran, 14 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Abdul Wakil Cyeef-Din. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Quan Tran voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kennedy, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Abdul Wakil Cyeef-Din voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kennedy, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Aaron Brick, Aaron Brown, Jason Fleming, Dylan Glenn, Arion Hayes, Jonathan Hickerson, James LaPorte, Brian Martinez, Nicholas Onken, Patrick Roberson, Lance Romero voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Brennan, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Aaron Brick, Aaron Brown, Jason Fleming, Dylan Glenn, Arion Hayes, Jonathan Hickerson, James LaPorte, Brian Martinez, Nicholas Onken, Patrick Roberson, Lance Romero. (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 5/13/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/29/2021. (ccp) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Aaron Brick of Acceptance of Service and Consent to Removal (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L Brennan on behalf of Aaron Brick (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Dylan Glenn Consent to Removal (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L Brennan on behalf of Dylan Glenn (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time because all of the defendants have not been served. See Doc. 1 at 2. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Aaron Brown, Jason Fleming, Arion Hayes, Jonathan Hickerson, James LaPorte, Brian Martinez, Nicholas Onken, Patrick Roberson, Lance Romero voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Brennan, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aaron Brown, Jason Fleming, Arion Hayes, Jonathan Hickerson, James LaPorte, Brian Martinez, Nicholas Onken, Patrick Roberson, Lance Romero (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rio Rancho Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Aaron Brown, Jason Fleming, Arion Hayes, Jonathan Hickerson, James LaPorte, Brian Martinez, Nicholas Onken, Patrick Roberson, Lance Romero. (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7547651 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Aaron Brown, Nicholas Onken, Patrick Roberson, Jason Fleming, Jonathan Hickerson, Lance Romero, Brian Martinez, Arion Hayes, James LaPorte (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicholas Onken, Lance Romero, Jonathan Hickerson, Jason Fleming, Brian Martinez, James LaPorte, Arion Hayes, Patrick Roberson, Aaron Brown from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1329-CV-2020-01904. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Nicholas Onken, Lance Romero, Jonathan Hickerson, Jason Fleming, Brian Martinez, James LaPorte, Arion Hayes, Patrick Roberson, Aaron Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet D)(Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam C. Flores

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy