Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:34:43 (UTC).

CyberX Group LLC et al v. CyberX LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 CyberX Group LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CyberX LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02501

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

CyberX Group, LLC

David E Lindsey

CyberX Group LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Christopher Pearson

CyberX, LLC

CyberX LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C Acosta

Attorney at Platt Cheema Richmond PLLC

1201 N Riverfront Blvd, Suite 150

Dallas, TX 75207

William S Richmond

Attorney at Platt Cheema Richmond PLLC

1201 N Riverfront Blvd, Suite 150

Dallas, TX 75207

Andrew Lin

Attorney at Platt Cheema Richmond PLLC

1201 N Riverfront Blvd, Suite 150

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Brian W Zimmerman

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

3040 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 1300

Houston, TX 77056-6560

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) AMENDED ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint,, filed by CyberX LLC, Christopher Pearson (Zimmerman, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#29

RESTRICTED

#28

(#28) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Motions due by 8/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/23/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/13/2020) (svc) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

27 #2

Exhibit(s) Redlined Version

27 #1

Exhibit(s) A-B

#25

(#25) Appendix in Support filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Original Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

24 #1

Proposed Order

23 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#23

(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to CyberX LLC, Christopher Pearson. (jmg) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Acosta, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened document on 8/25/2020) (pnp). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number 0539-11109453) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Acosta, Matthew) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (jmg). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AMENDED ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint,, filed by CyberX LLC, Christopher Pearson (Zimmerman, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on 09-08-2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawnie Archuleta, Telephone number shawnie505@aol.com. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (63 pages) Redaction Request due 11/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (spa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Motions due by 8/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/23/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/13/2020) (svc) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey re #25 Appendix in Support, #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Original Counterclaims Amended and Corrected Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B, #2 Exhibit(s) Redlined Version) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Appendix in Support filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Original Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Original Counterclaims filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/18/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CyberX LLC, Christopher Pearson. (Zimmerman, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The telephonic hearing is reset to Tuesday, September 8, at 10:00am. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/26/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants are hereby ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 7) by Friday, September 4, at 10:00am. It is furthered ORDERED that a telephonic hearing be held on Monday, September 7, at 3:00pm. More directions for the telephonic hearing will follow. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/26/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appendix in Support filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Declaration(s), #21 Declaration(s)) (Acosta, Matthew) (Attachment 18 replaced on 8/25/2020) (lrl). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by CyberX Group LLC, David E Lindsey (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CyberX LLC, Christopher Pearson. (jmg) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Acosta, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened document on 8/25/2020) (pnp). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by CyberX Group, LLC, David E Lindsey. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number 0539-11109453) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Acosta, Matthew) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (jmg). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew C Acosta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Lin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Scott Richmond