This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:46:33 (UTC).

CWR ELECTRONICS, INC. v. STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC against STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17102

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Zahid N. Quraishi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.

Defendants

STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC.

GREGORY J. BLAHUT

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Certification of Donald F. Campbell, Jr., Esq.

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9914751), filed by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

7 #3

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Final MOTION for Default Judgment as to Star Marine Depot, Inc. d/b/a Marine Electronics Unlimited and Gregory J. Blahut by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Donald F. Campbell, Jr., Esq., #2 Certification of Brian Swanke, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. GREGORY J. BLAHUT served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Request for Default by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC. against Defendant Star Marine Depot, Inc. d/b/a Marine Electronics Unlimited and Defendant Gregory J. Blahut. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GREGORY J. BLAHUT, STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

7 #2

Certification of Brian Swanke

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #7 Final MOTION for Default Judgment as to Star Marine Depot, Inc. d/b/a Marine Electronics Unlimited and Gregory J. Blahut. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Final MOTION for Default Judgment as to Star Marine Depot, Inc. d/b/a Marine Electronics Unlimited and Gregory J. Blahut by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Donald F. Campbell, Jr., Esq., #2 Certification of Brian Swanke, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC., GREGORY J. BLAHUT for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jdb) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Default by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC. against Defendant Star Marine Depot, Inc. d/b/a Marine Electronics Unlimited and Defendant Gregory J. Blahut. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. GREGORY J. BLAHUT served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GREGORY J. BLAHUT, STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. (CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against STAR MARINE DEPOT, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9914751), filed by CWR ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CAMPBELL, DONALD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.