This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 07:33:59 (UTC).

CVS Pharmacy, Inc. v. Withings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 CVS Pharmacy, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Withings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Defendant

Withings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam M. Ramos

Attorney at Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 1500, 274-2000, Fax: 277-9600

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Mariellen Dugan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1470075 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Kate E. Janukowicz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1470068 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Withings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Withings, Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1466805 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mariellen Dugan. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/31/2020. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kate E. Janukowicz. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 1/31/2020. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Mariellen Dugan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1470075 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Kate E. Janukowicz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1470068 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Withings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Withings, Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1466805 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Withings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Withings, Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1466805 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ramos, Adam) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less