This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 11:53:36 (UTC).

Cuthbert v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Cuthbert filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02292

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philomena Cuthbert

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda M. Lopez

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric A. Shore, PC

1500 John F. Kennedy Blvd., 2 Penn Center, Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Philomena Cuthbert. (Lopez, Linda) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/2021. (jr) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Philomena Cuthbert. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Lopez, Linda) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5378062), filed by Philomena Cuthbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Philomena Cuthbert. (Lopez, Linda) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/2021. (jr) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Philomena Cuthbert. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 12/8/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Lopez, Linda) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5378062), filed by Philomena Cuthbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDA MAALOUF LOPEZ