This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 07:18:12 (UTC).

Cusick v. Gualandri et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Cusick filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gualandri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06017

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Cusick

Defendants

Dave Gualandri

Brian Zielmann

The County of LaSalle

Rod Englert D/B/A Englert Forensics Consultants, LLC

Julius Ballanco

The City of Ottawa

Scott Denton

Karen Donnelly

Unidentified Employees of The City of Ottawa and The County of LaSalle

Scott Cruz

Jody Bernard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan I. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen, 3Rd Fl

Chicago, IL 60607

Tara Elizabeth Thompson

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N Aberdeen Street, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Makeba Alinda Kokugonz Rutahindurwa

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St.

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Bryan Dolezal

Attorney at Best, Vanderlaan & Harrington

25 W. Washington St., Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60602

Alison M Harrington

Attorney at Best,Vanderlaan & Harrington

1755 Park St.,, #260

Naperville, IL 60563

Dominick L Lanzito

Attorney at Peterson Johnson & Murray - Chicago LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2125

Chicago, IL 60606

Kevin Mark Casey

Attorney at Peterson, Johnson & Murray Chicago LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2125

Chicago, IL 60606

Faredin Ameti

Attorney at Doherty & Progar LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2220

Chicago, IL 60606-5231

Michael Thomas Sprengnether

Attorney at Doherty & Progar

200 W. Adams, Suite 2220

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael Robert Luchsinger

Attorney at Doherty & Progar, LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2220, Chicago

Chicago, IL 60606

Edward B. Ruff, III

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer, Chtd.

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606-4673

Robert L. Larsen

Attorney at Cunningham, Meyer & Vedrine, P.C.

4200 Cantera Drive, Suite 112

Warrenville, IL 60555

Anthony M Sam

Attorney at Cunningham, Meyer & Vedrine, P.C.

4200 Cantera Drive, Suite 112

Warrenville, IL 60555-3040

David T. Tichy

Attorney at Illinois Attorney Generals Office

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Kelly C. Bauer

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph St., 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jody Bernard, The County of LaSalle by Dominick L Lanzito (Lanzito, Dominick) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#34

(#34) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jody Bernard, The County of LaSalle by Kevin Mark Casey (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Scott Denton's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #31 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/28/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#32

(#32) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scott Denton by Anthony M Sam (Sam, Anthony) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#31

(#31) MOTION by Defendant Scott Denton for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Larsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#30

(#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scott Denton by Robert L. Larsen (Larsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#29

(#29) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott Cruz, Dave Gualandri, The City of Ottawa, Brian Zielmann by Scott Bryan Dolezal (Dolezal, Scott) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#28

(#28) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The City of Ottawa. The City of Ottawa waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#27

(#27) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Scott Cruz. Scott Cruz waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rod Englert by Faredin Ameti (Ameti, Faredin) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rod Englert by Michael Robert Luchsinger (Luchsinger, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Cusick as to Julius Ballanco on 10/31/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Cusick as to Rod Englert on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 12/22/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Cusick by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Cusick by Tara Elizabeth Thompson (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt # 0752-17525301 filed by Kenneth Cusick; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jody Bernard, The County of LaSalle by Dominick L Lanzito (Lanzito, Dominick) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jody Bernard, The County of LaSalle by Kevin Mark Casey (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Scott Denton's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #31 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/28/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scott Denton by Anthony M Sam (Sam, Anthony) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION by Defendant Scott Denton for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Larsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scott Denton by Robert L. Larsen (Larsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scott Cruz, Dave Gualandri, The City of Ottawa, Brian Zielmann by Scott Bryan Dolezal (Dolezal, Scott) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by The City of Ottawa. The City of Ottawa waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Scott Cruz. Scott Cruz waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dave Gualandri. Dave Gualandri waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Harrington, Alison) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rod Englert by Faredin Ameti (Ameti, Faredin) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rod Englert by Michael Robert Luchsinger (Luchsinger, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Cusick as to Julius Ballanco on 10/31/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Cusick as to Rod Englert on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 12/22/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Julius Ballanco, Jody Bernard, Scott Cruz, Scott Denton, Karen Donnelly, Rod Englert, Dave Gualandri, The City of Ottawa, The County of LaSalle, Brian Zielmann (cm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) Modified on 10/9/2020 (pj, ). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Cusick by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Cusick by Tara Elizabeth Thompson (Thompson, Tara) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt # 0752-17525301 filed by Kenneth Cusick; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara Elizabeth Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan I. Loevy